Davinna Tyrone Harris
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02136 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/23/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
29
12/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/08/2019
Corrective Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
01/08/2019
Compensation
36
01/09/2019
Notice of Hearing - (Van020 Enter Matter)
37
01/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/28/2019
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
02/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.