Dawn Michelle Jones and Christopher William Jones
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00129 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Amended Application / Motion
doc
05/23/2018
Certificate of Service
doc
05/25/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
05/29/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
06/01/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/04/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
22
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
06/08/2018
Certificate of No Objection
24
06/08/2018
Certificate of Service
25
06/11/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
26
06/15/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
27
06/15/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
28
06/18/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
29
06/18/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
30
06/27/2018
Proceeding Memo
31
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
32
07/11/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
33
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
34
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
35
08/13/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
36
08/15/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
08/16/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
08/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
38
08/22/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
39
08/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
40
08/31/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.