Dawn N McKinnis
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02145 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
doc
05/24/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/24/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
31
08/17/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.