Dayton v. Stolc
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2003-cv-00145 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
162
08/01/2018
Status Report
08/10/2018
Order Setting Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
165
09/05/2018
Certificate of Service
09/12/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
169
10/22/2018
Notice of Appearance
170
10/22/2018
Notice of Appearance
11/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
172
11/21/2018
Notice (Other)
11/28/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
173
11/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
176
01/07/2019
Extension of Time to File Answer
177
01/07/2019
Affidavit
178
01/08/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
179
02/06/2019
Extension of Time to File Answer
180
02/06/2019
Affidavit
181
02/06/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.