De Lima v. Sessions

2015-02453 (ca1)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 272 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
11/30/2015
AGENCY CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. Administrative record due 01/11/2016. Appearance form and Fee due 12/14/2015. Copy of petition served on respondent(s) pursuant to FRAP 15(c). [15-2453] (TS) [Entered: 11/30/2015 03:37 PM]
doc
11/30/2015
MOTION to stay removal filed by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. Certificate of service dated 11/30/2015. [15-2453] (TS) [Entered: 11/30/2015 03:41 PM]
11/30/2015
MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. Certificate of service dated 11/30/2015. [15-2453] (TS) [Entered: 11/30/2015 03:42 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/30/2015
Request to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Evandro De Lima is pending in the Court of Appeals. [15-2453] (TS) [Entered: 11/30/2015 03:45 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
12/01/2015
RESPONSE filed by Respondent Loretta E. Lynch to motion to stay removal [5957259-2]. Certificate of service dated 12/01/2015. [15-2453] (DHW) [Entered: 12/01/2015 02:04 PM]
doc
12/01/2015
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Respondent Loretta E. Lynch filed by Attorney David Wetmore. Certificate of service dated 12/01/2015. [15-2453] (DHW) [Entered: 12/01/2015 02:30 PM]
doc
12/11/2015
ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge: The request for a stay of removal is denied because petitioner has failed to satisfy the criteria set forth in Nken v. Holder, 556 U.S. 418, 434 (2009). [15-2453] (TS) [Entered: 12/11/2015 11:11 AM]
12/11/2015
ADMINISTRATIVE record filed. [15-2453] (TS) [Entered: 12/11/2015 11:20 AM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
12/11/2015
BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 01/20/2016 for petitioner Evandro De Lima. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), respondent's brief will be due 30 days following service of petitioner's brief and petitioner's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of respondent's brief. [15-2453] (TS) [Entered: 12/11/2015 11:22 AM]
doc
12/14/2015
MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2015. [15-2453] (PL) [Entered: 12/14/2015 02:31 AM]
doc
12/14/2015
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Petitioner Evandro De Lima filed by Attorney Patrick Long. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2015. [15-2453] (PL) [Entered: 12/14/2015 02:39 AM]
12/16/2015
Request to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Evandro De Lima is pending in the Court of Appeals. [15-2453] (GK) [Entered: 12/16/2015 10:07 AM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2015
DUPLICATE COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE record filed. [15-2453] (TS) [Entered: 12/22/2015 08:48 AM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
12/21/2015
ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. [15-2453] (TS) [Entered: 12/21/2015 02:28 PM]
01/15/2016
PLEADING tendered: Appendix filed by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. Certificate of service dated 01/15/2016. [15-2453] (KC) [Entered: 01/15/2016 04:52 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
01/19/2016
ORDER directing Petitioner Evandro De Lima to file a conforming appendix. Appendix due 01/26/2016. [15-2453] (TS) [Entered: 01/19/2016 12:01 PM]
doc
01/20/2016
BRIEF tendered by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. Certificate of service dated 01/20/2016. [15-2453] (PL) [Entered: 01/20/2016 07:16 AM]
doc
01/20/2016
PETITIONER'S BRIEF filed by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. Certificate of service dated 01/20/2016. Brief due 02/22/2016 for RESPONDENT Loretta E. Lynch. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 01/27/2016. [15-2453] (MH) [Entered: 01/20/2016 09:58 AM]
01/26/2016
PLEADING tendered: Appendix filed by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. [15-2453] (KC) [Entered: 01/26/2016 04:44 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/27/2016
APPENDIX filed by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 01/26/2016. [15-2453] (KC) [Entered: 01/27/2016 11:42 AM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/27/2016
NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [5970635-2] submitted by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. [15-2453] (CC) [Entered: 01/28/2016 08:13 AM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
02/11/2016
RESPONDENT'S BRIEF filed by Respondent Loretta E. Lynch. Certificate of service dated 02/10/2016. Reply brief due 02/29/2016 for PETITIONER Evandro De Lima. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/18/2016. [15-2453] (MH) [Entered: 02/11/2016 09:09 AM]
02/16/2016
NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [5976408-2] submitted by Respondent Loretta E. Lynch. [15-2453] (CC) [Entered: 02/16/2016 03:07 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
02/28/2016
BRIEF tendered by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. Certificate of service dated 02/28/2016. [15-2453] (PL) [Entered: 02/28/2016 10:22 PM]
doc
02/29/2016
REPLY BRIEF filed by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. Certificate of service dated 02/28/2016. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 03/07/2016. [15-2453] (KC) [Entered: 02/29/2016 11:48 AM]
03/07/2016
NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [5980721-2] submitted by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. [15-2453] (CC) [Entered: 03/07/2016 04:22 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/01/2016
CASE submitted. Panel: William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge; Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge; Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge. [15-2453] (DT) [Entered: 08/01/2016 10:44 AM]
02/15/2017
Public docket note: Jeff Sessions was sworn in as Attorney General of the United States on February 9, 2017. We have substituted him for Loretta Lynch as the respondent. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [15-2453] (TS) [Entered: 02/15/2017 03:05 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
02/15/2017
ORDER entered by Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge: The submission notice of August 1, 2016 is hereby vacated. It is anticipated that oral argument will be scheduled for April 4, 2017. [15-2453] (DT) [Entered: 02/15/2017 04:47 PM]
doc
02/20/2017
MOTION to reschedule oral argument filed by Petitioner Evandro De Lima. Certificate of service dated 02/20/2017. [15-2453] (PL) [Entered: 02/20/2017 09:29 PM]
doc
02/22/2017
ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge : The Petitioner's motion to continue is granted. It is anticipated that oral argument will be scheduled for Thursday, May 4, 2017. [15-2453] (DT) [Entered: 02/22/2017 05:16 PM]
doc
02/23/2017
MOTION requesting leave for Attorney Brianne Whelan Cohen to enter an appearance filed by Respondent Jefferson B. Sessions, III in 15-2453. Certificate of service dated 02/23/2017. [15-2453] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case, 15-2157 as that case is closed. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. CLERK'S NOTE: The wrong PDF file was attached. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS.(02/27/2017) (BWC) [Entered: 02/23/2017 01:49 PM]
doc
03/06/2017
MOTION requesting leave for Attorney Brianne Whelan Cohen to enter an appearance filed by Respondent Jefferson B. Sessions, III in 15-2453. Certificate of service dated 03/06/2017. [15-2453] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case, 15-2157. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (BWC) [Entered: 03/06/2017 11:03 AM]
doc
03/24/2017
CASE calendared: Thursday, 05/04/2017 AM Boston, MA Panel Courtroom. Designation form due 04/07/2017. [15-2453] (DT) [Entered: 03/24/2017 03:47 PM]
doc
03/31/2017
DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Brianne Whelan Cohen for Respondent Jefferson B. Sessions, III. Certificate of service dated 03/31/2017. [15-2453] (BWC) [Entered: 03/31/2017 11:28 AM]
doc
04/05/2017
DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Patrick Long for Petitioner Evandro De Lima in 15-2453. Certificate of service dated 04/05/2017. [15-2453, 15-2157] (PL) [Entered: 04/05/2017 10:34 PM]
05/04/2017
CASE argued. Panel: William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge; Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge and Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge. Arguing attorneys: Patrick Long for Evandro De Lima and Brianne Whelan Cohen for Jefferson B. Sessions, III. [15-2453] (DT) [Entered: 05/04/2017 11:45 AM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/16/2017
OPINION issued by William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge; Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge and Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge. Published. LIPEZ Circuit Judge, dissenting. [15-2453] (KC) [Entered: 08/16/2017 04:37 PM]
doc
08/16/2017
JUDGMENT entered. Denied. [15-2453] (KC) [Entered: 08/16/2017 04:45 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.