Dea C Kang
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00242 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
07/30/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
07/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
07/30/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
07/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
07/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
08/06/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
13
08/08/2018
Request for Special Notice
14
08/25/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
15
08/31/2018
Entry of Appearance
16
09/19/2018
Employ (CM41)
17
09/19/2018
Declaration
18
09/21/2018
Employ
19
10/11/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
20
10/12/2018
Stipulation
21
10/12/2018
Approving Stipulation (SA)
10/12/2018
Update Deadline (Discharge / Closing) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
10/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
10/24/2018
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
25
10/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
11/07/2018
Extend Time
27
11/07/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
28
11/07/2018
Certificate of Service
29
11/20/2018
Generic Motion / Application
11/29/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
11/30/2018
Certificate of No Objection
31
11/30/2018
Extend Time
32
11/30/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
33
11/30/2018
Certificate of Service
34
11/30/2018
Certificate of Service
35
12/05/2018
Employ (CM41)
36
12/05/2018
Declaration
37
12/06/2018
Sell Free and Clear of Liens (Hrg Rqd, Under 363(f)) (Fee) (CM21)
38
12/06/2018
Memorandum in Support
12/06/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
12/06/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
40
12/06/2018
Certificate of Service
12/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
12/10/2018
Certificate of Service
12/12/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
12/12/2018
Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)
43
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim
44
12/21/2018
Extend Time
45
12/31/2018
Extend Time
46
12/31/2018
Generic Motion
47
12/31/2018
Notice of Denial or Waiver of Discharge (Prepare Notice Not a BNC Notice)
01/02/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
01/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
49
01/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/08/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
01/08/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
51
01/10/2019
Proceeding Memo
52
01/10/2019
Sell Free and Clear of Liens
53
01/10/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
01/11/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
01/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
55
01/14/2019
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
56
01/14/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
57
01/15/2019
Employ
01/16/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
02/06/2019
Employ (CM41)
59
02/07/2019
Report of Sale
60
02/08/2019
Employ
61
03/25/2019
Stipulation on Proof of Claim
62
03/29/2019
Compensation / Professional Fees
63
03/29/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
64
03/29/2019
Certificate of Service
65
04/19/2019
Certificate of No Objection
04/19/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.