Deborah A Cargill
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00038 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
06/01/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
30
06/05/2018
Declaration
06/05/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
06/05/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
32
06/05/2018
Certificate of Service
06/05/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
06/05/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
34
06/20/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
35
06/20/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
36
06/20/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
37
07/11/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
38
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
39
07/20/2018
Proceeding Memo
40
08/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
41
08/02/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
42
08/03/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
43
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
44
08/21/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
45
08/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
46
08/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
47
09/24/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.