Deborah Darlene Barnes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00168 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
doc
05/31/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
05/31/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
QC Remark Re: Summary, Stat & Declaration (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
doc
05/31/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
05/31/2018
Terminate Document / Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/01/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
06/01/2018
Update Deadline (Installment Payments) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/01/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
doc
06/01/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
06/05/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
06/06/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
17
06/14/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
06/15/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
07/02/2018
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
07/02/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
07/02/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
20
07/03/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
07/10/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
07/12/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
07/12/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
23
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
24
07/19/2018
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
25
07/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
07/23/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
07/24/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
07/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
08/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
29
08/03/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
08/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
31
08/14/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
32
08/20/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
33
08/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
08/23/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.