Debra Nancy Terry and Gregary Dean Terry
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-00335 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)
doc
06/01/2018
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
48
06/22/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
49
07/17/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
50
07/17/2018
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
51
08/20/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
52
08/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/23/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.