Deirdre A Miller
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2015-bk-00277 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
06/01/2018
Relief from Stay
06/01/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
122
08/21/2018
Substitution of Attorney
123
08/21/2018
Certificate of Service
124
08/21/2018
Entry of Appearance
08/23/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
125
08/29/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
126
09/19/2018
Entry of Appearance
127
09/19/2018
Substitution of Attorney
09/19/2018
Terminate Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
128
10/09/2018
Redact (Fee)
10/09/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
129
02/13/2019
Dismiss Case (No Hrg Rqd for Ch 13, Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)
130
02/13/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
131
02/13/2019
Certificate of Service
132
03/06/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
03/11/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
133
03/26/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
134
03/26/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
135
04/15/2019
Support Documentation
136
04/16/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
137
04/16/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.