DelPriore v. Easy Park et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00113 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
6
05/18/2018
Notice of Change of Address
7
05/30/2018
Notice (Other)
8
10/11/2018
Notice of Change of Address
9
10/12/2018
Appoint Counsel
10
10/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11
10/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12
10/22/2018
Order
10/26/2018
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
11/07/2018
Unissued Summons
11/07/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
12/10/2018
Notice of Appearance
16
12/11/2018
Notice of Appearance
17
12/12/2018
Notice of Change of Address
18
12/19/2018
Summons Returned Executed
19
12/19/2018
Summons Returned Executed
20
12/19/2018
Summons Returned Executed
21
12/19/2018
Summons Returned Executed
22
12/19/2018
Summons Returned Executed
23
12/20/2018
Answer to Complaint
24
12/21/2018
Summons Returned Executed
25
12/26/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
26
12/28/2018
Discovery
27
01/04/2019
Notice (Other)
28
01/14/2019
Answer to Complaint
29
01/14/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
30
01/17/2019
Scheduling Order
31
01/22/2019
Witness List
32
01/23/2019
Order on Motion for Discovery
33
02/01/2019
Corporate Disclosure Statement
34
02/06/2019
Order
35
03/19/2019
Compel
36
03/20/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
37
03/29/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
38
03/29/2019
Supplement
39
04/02/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
40
04/02/2019
Notice (Other)
41
04/09/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
42
04/29/2019
Order on Motion to Compel
43
05/10/2019
Amend/Correct

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.