Dennis Freo Paniza and Meike June Paniza
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00061 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
29
06/05/2018
Request for Special Notice
30
06/06/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
31
06/07/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
06/07/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
06/21/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
34
06/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
06/27/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.