Depriest, et al v. Telelect, Inc., et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

1:1991-cv-01564 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 631 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/23/1991
DEMAND for jury trial by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest (war) Modified on 04/02/1993
2
12/23/1991
SUMMONS issued for Telelect, Inc., Reliance National, Reliance Insurance; summons and complaint mailed by CMRRR to named defendants
3
01/02/1992
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Telelect, Inc. 12/27/91 Answer due on 1/16/92 for Telelect, Inc.
4
01/07/1992
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Reliance National, Reliance Insurance 12/27/91 Answer due on 1/16/92 for Reliance Insurance, for Reliance National
5
01/17/1992
ANSWER to Complaint by Telelect, Inc. (Attorney Michael D. Knight), referred to Judge Albritton.
01/17/1992
AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for defendant. (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/1992
CASE REFERRED to Judge W. H. Albritton III (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
02/18/1992
MOTION by Reliance National, Reliance Insurance for Summary Judgment ; (Motion to Dismiss filed 2/18/92 treated as Motion for Summary Judgment per Order of 5/22/92) referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
7
02/18/1992
MOTION by Reliance National, Reliance Insurance for Edward Zulkey and Ronald L. Ohren to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 20 RECEIPT # 43058 referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
8
02/20/1992
MOTION by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest to Extend Time to respond to discovery referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
9
02/21/1992
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Why defendants Reliance National's and Relinance Insurance Company of New York's motion to Dismiss filed 2/l8/92 should not be granted, Response to order to show cause due 3/2/92 for Denise DePriest, for Steve DePriest (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel.
10
02/21/1992
ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Edward Zulkey and Ronald L. Ohren to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 20 RECEIPT # 43058 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel. (dkt clerk)
11
02/21/1992
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 6/30/92; Motion Filing Deadline on 5/6/92; Discovery cutoff 6/16/92; jury trial set for 8/10/92; (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furn. to Ern and Marie. (dkt clerk)
02/24/1992
Stamped ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery, copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
03/09/1992
MEMORANDUM by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest in opposition to [6-1] motion to Dismiss plaintiffs' complaint by Reliance Insurance, Reliance National, referred to Judge Albritton.
13
03/26/1992
REPLY by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest to response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss plaintiffs' complaint by Reliance Insurance, Reliance National referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
14
04/28/1992
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest by Jere L. Beasley, Frank M. Wilson, Blaine Celone Stevens
15
04/28/1992
Joint letter re: Settlement letter, referred to Judge Albritton.
16
04/30/1992
MOTION by Telelect, Inc. to Compel discovery, for Sanctions for expenses and fees required in filing this motion and obtaining responses referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
17
05/01/1992
ORDER, Referring Case to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody for all pending discovery disputes (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel.
05/01/1992
File referred to Judge Albritton. (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
05/08/1992
MOTION by Telelect, Inc. for Summary Judgment (requesting oral argument; Exhibits A & B attached) referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
19
05/08/1992
BRIEF IN SUPPORT of [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Telelect, Inc., referred to Judge Albritton.
20
05/08/1992
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Why defendant Telelect, Inc.'s motion to compel filed 4/30/92 should not be granted and attorney fees should not be awarded, Response to order to show cause due 5/22/92 for Denise DePriest, for Steve DePriest (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody) copies mailed to counsel. (war) Modified on 04/02/1993
21
05/11/1992
ORDER [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Telelect, Inc. set for submission on 6/8/92, set Plaintiffs' Brief deadline to 6/1/92, set Defendants' Brief deadline to 6/8/92 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel.
22
05/14/1992
ORDER, set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 8/10/92 ; Pretrial Conference for 1:00 7/1/92 ; Proposed Pretrial Order due 8/6/92 ; (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Ern and Marie.
23
05/22/1992
ORDER, Motion Docket date set for 11:00 7/1/92 for [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment, parties may supplement their submissions by 6/l5/92, any reply to said submission shall be filed by 6/23/92; that the pretrial hearing shall follow oral argument. (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Ern and Marie.
24
05/22/1992
Response to order to show cause by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest; referred to Magistrate Judge Coody.
25
05/27/1992
ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 12/2/92 ; Motion Filing deadline on 8/10/92 ; Discovery cutoff 11/18/92 ; jury trial set for 1/5/93 ; (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Ern and Marie.
26
05/27/1992
MOTION by Reliance National, Reliance Insurance for Summary Judgment referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
27
05/29/1992
MOTION by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest to Continue 6/l/92 submission date for Plaintiffs' brief and submission of evidentiary materials in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
28
05/29/1992
ORDER terminating [27-1] motion to Continue 6/l/92 submission date for Plaintiffs' brief and submission of evidentiary materials in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment, set Plaintiff's Brief deadline to 6/11/92, set Defendant Telelect, Inc.'s Brief deadline to 6/18/92 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel.
29
06/01/1992
ORDER denying [16-1] motion to Compel discovery, denying [16-2] motion for Sanctions for expenses and fees required in filing this motion and obtaining responses; directing plaintiffs to file a response to defendants' interrogatories and request for production by 6/22/92. (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
31
06/10/1992
AFFIDAVIT by Steve DePriest Re: [26-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Reliance Insurance, Reliance National, [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Telelect, Inc., referred to Judge Albritton.
32
06/10/1992
AFFIDAVIT of Samuel A. Cherry Jr Re: [26-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Reliance Insurance, Reliance National, [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Telelect, Inc. (Exhibits A-I attached) referred to Judge Albritton.
33
06/11/1992
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to [26-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest, referred to Judge Albritton.
34
06/11/1992
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to [26-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest (Exhibits l-8 attached and maintained in seperate binder), referred to Judge Albritton. (war) Modified on 04/02/1993
35
06/18/1992
MOTION by Reliance National, Reliance Insurance to Dismiss amended complaint referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
36
06/22/1992
MOTION by Telelect, Inc. to Extend Time to respond to the submissions filed by plaintiffs in opposition of the motion for summary judgment referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
37
06/25/1992
MOTION by Telelect, Inc. to Dismiss amended complaint referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
38
06/25/1992
BRIEF IN SUPPORT of [37-1] motion to Dismiss amended complaint by Telelect, Inc., referred to Judge Albritton
40
06/25/1992
BRIEF IN SUPPORT of [39-1] motion to Strike portions of [32-1] affidavit, [31-1] affidavit by Steve DePriest by Telelect, Inc., Reliance National, Reliance Insurance
41
06/25/1992
REPLY by Telelect, Inc. to response to [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Telelect, Inc. referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
42
06/29/1992
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why defendant's motion to dismiss and motion to strike filed by defendant Telelect, Inc on 6/25/92 should not be granted: Response to order to show cause due 7/10/92 for Denise DePriest, for Steve DePriest (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel.
44
07/13/1992
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to [37-1] motion to Dismiss amended complaint by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest, referred to Judge Albritton.
45
07/13/1992
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to [39-1] motion to Strike portions of [32-1] affidavit, [31-1] affidavit by Steve DePriest by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest, referred to Judge Albritton.
46
07/20/1992
REPLY by Telelect, Inc. to response to [39-1] motion to Strike portions of [32-1] affidavit, [31-1] affidavit by Steve DePriest by Telelect, Inc. referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
47
07/22/1992
REPLY by Telelect, Inc. to response to [37-1] motion to Dismiss amended complaint by Telelect, Inc. referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
48
07/23/1992
MOTION by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest to Compel defendants to produce the documents requested in the plaintiffs' subpoena to Henry C. Chappell, Jr. referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
49
07/24/1992
RESPONSE by Reliance National, Reliance Insurance to [39-1] motion to Strike portions of [32-1] affidavit, [31-1] affidavit by Steve DePriest by Telelect, Inc., [37-1] motion to Dismiss amended complaint by Telelect, Inc., (letter form), referred to Judge Albritton.
50
08/17/1992
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to [48-1] motion to Compel defendants to produce the documents requested in the plaintiffs' subpoena to Henry C. Chappell, Jr. by Telelect, Inc., referred to Magistrate Judge Coody.
51
08/18/1992
BRIEF IN SUPPORT of [48-1] motion to Compel defendants to produce the documents requested in the plaintiffs' subpoena to Henry C. Chappell, Jr. by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest, (w/attachments) referred to Magistrate Judge Coody.
52
08/20/1992
RESPONSE by Reliance National, Reliance Insurance to [48-1] motion to Compel defendants to produce the documents requested in the plaintiffs' subpoena to Henry C. Chappell, Jr. by Denise DePriest, Steve DePriest, referred to Magistrate Judge Coody.
53
08/20/1992
SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT of [26-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Reliance National, Reliance Insurance (w/attachment), referred to Judge Albritton.
54
08/31/1992
MOTION by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest to certify questions to the Supreme Court of Alabama referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
55
09/03/1992
ORDER [54-1] motion to certify questions to the Supreme Court of Alabama by Denise DePriest, Steve DePriest set for submission on 9/16/92 (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to cousel.
56
09/16/1992
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to [54-1] motion to certify questions to the Supreme Court of Alabama by Telelect, Inc., referred to Judge Albritton.
57
09/16/1992
RESPONSE by Reliance National, Reliance Insurance to [54-1] motion to certify questions to the Supreme Court of Alabama by Denise DePriest, Steve DePriest, referred to Judge Albritton.
58
09/18/1992
REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT of [54-1] motion to certify questions to the Supreme Court of Alabama by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest, referred to Judge Albritton.
59
09/30/1992
ADDITIONAL SUPPORT of [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Telelect, Inc. (Exhibits A-C attached), referred to Judge Albritton.
60
10/13/1992
MOTION by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest to Compel Telect, Inc. to produce corporate representatives for the depositions noticed by Plaintiff on 9/2/92 referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
10/19/1992
Motion hearing held re: [60-1] motion to Compel Telect, Inc. to produce corporate representatives for the depositions noticed by Plaintiff on 9/2/92 by Denise DePriest, Steve DePriest, [48-1] motion to Compel defendants to produce the documents requested in the plaintiffs' subpoena to Henry C. Chappell, Jr. by Denise DePriest, Steve DePriest (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
10/19/1992
ORDER deferring consideration of the l0/l3/92 motion to compel to a later date; directing the parties to inform the court when the motion is ripe for consideration; that counsel for the defendants shall deliver to the court for in camera inspection by l0/23/92, the files of the Hon. Henry C. Chappel, Jr. relating to DePriest v. Telect, Inc.; that counsel for the plaintiffs shall deliver to the court in camera a letter detailing the nature of the documents from Mr. Chappel's files which counsel believes relevant in this case by l0/23/92 (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
62
10/22/1992
ORDER, set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 1/4/93 ; Pretrial Conference for 10:00 12/2/92 ; Proposed Pretrial Order due 11/30/92 ; (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Ern and Marie.
63
11/16/1992
JOINT MOTION by Steve DePriest, Denise DePriest, Telelect, Inc., Reliance National, Reliance Insurance to Extend Time to complete discovery, for scheduling conference referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
64
11/16/1992
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to [60-1] motion to Compel Telect, Inc. to produce corporate representatives for the depositions noticed by Plaintiff on 9/2/92 by Telelect, Inc., referred to Magistrate Judge Coody.
65
11/24/1992
ORDER granting [63-1] joint motion to Extend Time to complete discovery; that all previous orders of the court setting pretrial and trial dates, together with deadlines for discovery, are set aside and extended indefinitely pending resolution of all motions presently before the court terminated deadlines (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Marie and Ern. (war) Modified on 04/08/1993
66
01/13/1993
ORDER denying as moot [60-1] motion to Compel Telect, Inc. to produce corporate representatives for the depositions noticed by Plaintiff on 9/2/92; granting leave to reassert this motion at a later date if necessary, denying [48-1] motion to Compel defendants to produce the documents requested in the plaintiffs' subpoena to Henry C. Chappell, Jr., directing clerk to file under seal the documents reviewed by the court; identifying these documents as exhibits to this order (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel. (war) Modified on 04/02/1993
67
01/19/1993
MOTION by Telelect, Inc. for a more definite statement referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
68
06/04/1993
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot [67-1] motion for a more definite statement, denying as moot [63-2] joint motion for scheduling conference, denying as moot [54-1] motion to certify questions to the Supreme Court of Alabama, denying as moot [43-1] motion to Strike [32-1] portions of affidavit, [31-1] portions of affidavit by Steve DePriest, denying as moot [39-1] motion to Strike portions of [32-1] affidavit, [31-1] affidavit by Steve DePriest, denying as moot [37-1] motion to Dismiss amended complaint, denying as moot [36-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the submissions filed by plaintiffs in opposition of the motion for summary judgment, denying as moot [35-1] motion to Dismiss amended complaint, denying as moot [30-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint, granting [26-1] motion for Summary Judgment, granting [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment, granting [6-1] motion for Summary Judgment; costs to be taxed against plaintiff (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT and EL. (dkt clerk) Modified on 06/04/1993
06/04/1993
Case closed (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
06/22/1993
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Steve DePriest and Denise DePriest to the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit from the final judgment entered in this case 6/4/93. (Copies mailed to Frank M. Wilson with appeal information and civil docketing statement; L. Landis Sexton; Michael D. Knight & Henry T. Morrissette; Tabor R. Novak, Jr.; Edward J. Zulkey & Ronald L. Ohren; and certified copy to USCA with copies of orders appealed from.) FILING FEE $105.00 RECEIPT #48181 (dkt clerk) Modified on 09/09/1993
07/01/1993
USCA Case Number Re: [69-1] appeal by Denise DePriest, Steve DePriest USCA NUMBER: 93-6534 (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/05/1993
Received copy of correspondence from USCA (dated 8/3/93) advising court reporter Lewis Wimberley that transcript was due 8/2/93; 10% discount required for fling after: 10/1/93. Re: No. 93-6534. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/1993
Court reporter's official TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of July 1, 1992 (Oral Argument On Motions For Summary Judgment) held before Hon. W. Harold Albritton. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/09/1993
CERTIFICATE OF READINESS of record on appeal mailed to USCA, 11th Circuit and counsel: [69-1] appeal by Denise DePriest, Steve DePriest (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
09/29/1993
MOTION (received from USCA 10/22/93) by Reliance National, Reliance Insurance to supplement record on appeal (Exhibit "A" attached) referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
71
10/28/1993
ORDER granting [70-1] motion to supplement record on appeal; DIRECTING the clerk to supplement the record by certifying Exhibit "A" to the motion and transmitting it to the Court of Appeals. (signed by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies mailed. (dkt clerk)
10/28/1993
Transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal: [69-1] appeal by Denise DePriest, Steve DePriest (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/03/1993
Received correspondence from USCA (dated 10/26/93) advising appellant that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the default noted have been corrected: *File record excerpts as required by 11th Cir. R. 30-1, together with a motion to file the record excerpts out of time. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/16/1993
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of RECEIPT of RECORD ON APPEAL from USCA Re: [69-1] appeal by Denise DePriest, Steve DePriest USCA Number: 93-6534 (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
08/15/1994
Received certified copy of PER CURIAM: RULE 36-1 decision and JUDGMENT OF USCA issued as mandate 8/12/94 Re: [69-1] appeal by Denise DePriest, Steve DePriest; AFFIRMING the district court; taxing costs against plaintiffs-appellants. (dkt clerk)
08/15/1994
Record on Appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [69-1] appeal (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.