Derrick Kendall Collins
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02143 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
doc
05/23/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments
doc
05/23/2018
Notice to File Matrix
doc
05/24/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/24/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/24/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing and Show Cause Hearing
doc
05/24/2018
Order Denying Application for Payment of Filing Fees in Installments (Non-image)
05/24/2018
Notes Public (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/24/2018
Notice to Show Cause
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/31/2018
Dismissing Case (Matrix non-compliance)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.