Developers Surety and Indemnity Company v. Baker et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00119 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
41
05/29/2018
Order on Motion for Sanctions
42
05/31/2018
Summary Judgment
43
05/31/2018
Affidavit
44
05/31/2018
Memorandum
45
06/04/2018
Order
46
06/11/2018
Entry of Default
47
06/11/2018
Affidavit
48
07/02/2018
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
49
07/03/2018
Judgment
50
07/17/2018
Attorney Fees
51
07/17/2018
Affidavit
52
07/17/2018
Memorandum
53
08/10/2018
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.