Dexter Lamar Miles
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00419 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/08/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
12/08/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
12/08/2018
Income and Expense Report
3
12/08/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
4
12/08/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
5
12/08/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
6
12/09/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
12/10/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
12/10/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12/11/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
12/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
11
12/12/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
12
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
14
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
17
12/15/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
18
12/19/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
19
12/19/2018
Certificate of Service
01/09/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
01/10/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
21
01/10/2019
Affidavit
22
01/14/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
23
01/21/2019
Entry of Appearance
24
01/21/2019
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
25
02/22/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
26
02/26/2019
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
27
02/26/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
02/26/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
02/27/2019
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
02/27/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
02/28/2019
Proceeding Memo
30
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
03/06/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
03/07/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
32
03/08/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
33
03/08/2019
Certificate of Service
04/12/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
04/12/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
35
04/16/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
04/16/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
04/16/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
37
04/16/2019
Certificate of Service
38
04/18/2019
Proceeding Memo
39
04/22/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
40
04/25/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
41
05/02/2019
Proceeding Memo
42
05/03/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
43
05/06/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
44
05/06/2019
Hearing
45
05/09/2019
Proceeding Memo
46
05/09/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
05/10/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
05/15/2019
Proceeding Memo
48
05/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
49
05/17/2019
Withdrawal of Document / Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.