Diana Denise Hickman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00202 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/29/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
06/29/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
06/29/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/29/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
06/29/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
5
06/29/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
6
06/29/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
07/02/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
07/03/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
11
07/03/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
07/03/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
07/03/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
13
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
14
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
15
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
16
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
08/08/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
08/20/2018
Entry of Appearance
18
08/20/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
19
08/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
08/23/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
08/30/2018
Proceeding Memo
21
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
09/05/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
23
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
10/17/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
11/01/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
25
11/01/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
26
11/06/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
27
11/06/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
11/07/2018
QC Remark Re: Summary, Stat & Declaration (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
11/07/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
29
11/07/2018
Declaration About Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec and 202)
30
11/07/2018
Declaration
31
11/13/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
32
11/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.