Dianna Michelle Kessler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00089 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
38
10/04/2018
Voluntary Conversion From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Fee)
39
10/04/2018
BR1019 Report of Post Petition Debts
40
10/04/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
41
10/04/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
42
10/04/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
10/04/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
10/10/2018
Converting Case To Chapter 7 (BKCONV01-COAfter) (SA)
10/10/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
10/10/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
45
10/10/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
46
10/10/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
47
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
48
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
49
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
50
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
51
10/18/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
11/16/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.