Dickerson, et al v. Cushman, Inc., et al
Court Docket Sheet

1:1994-cv-00430 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 485 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/12/1994
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton against TIECO, Inc. amending [1-1] complaint; jury demand
2
04/12/1994
NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal to Clerk of the Circuit Court by Cushman, Inc., TIECO, Inc.
04/12/1994
CASE REFERRED to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
04/13/1994
AMENDED NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal to the Clerk of Circuit Court by Cushman, Inc., TIECO, Inc.
04/14/1994
File referred to Judge DeMent. (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
04/15/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by Cushman, Inc. (Attorney Ronald Davenport), referred to Judge Ira De Ment
5
04/21/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by TIECO, Inc. (Attorney James B. Carlson), referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
04/21/1994
AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for defendant. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
04/28/1994
MOTION by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton for Protective Order restraining the Army from modifying the condition of the subject vehicle until plaintiffs and defense are allowed to examine the vehicle for purposes of pretrial discovery referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
7
05/03/1994
ORDER (rendered 5/2/94) terminating [6-1] motion for Protective Order restraining the Army from modifying the condition of the subject vehicle until plaintiffs and defense are allowed to examine the vehicle for purposes of pretrial discovery; that the Plaintiffs, defendants, Dept of D.P.W. shall not, for a period of 60 days from this date, undertake any action that would change the condition of the vehicle from that which it is in at the preset time (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed. ORDER AMENDED PER ORDER of 9/l6/94 (war) Modified on 09/16/1994
8
05/10/1994
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 10/14/94 before Judge Ira De Ment Motion Filing deadline on 7/25/94 ; Discovery cutoff 9/30/94 ; jury trial set for 12/5/94 before Judge Ira De Ment ; (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Ridge, Marie.
9
05/12/1994
Plaintiffs' NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL, referred to Judge DeMent.
10
07/07/1994
Parties letter re: Settlement, referred to Judge DeMent.
11
08/02/1994
MOTION by Cushman, Inc. for court order requiring US Dept of Labor to release workers' compensation records (Exhibit A attached), referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (dkt clerk)
12
08/05/1994
ORDER granting [11-1] motion for court order requiring US Dept of Labor to release workers' compensation records; that the US Dept of Labor deliver files on Jimmy Dickerson and Matthew Hutton as further set out upon payment by Mr. Davenport of its reasonable costs for copying said records; that upon receipt of the records by counsel for defendant Cushman, the records shall be made available for plaintiffs upon their payment of the reasonable cost of copying the records, (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel. VACATED PER ORDER OF 8/l6/94 (dkt clerk) Modified on 08/16/1994
13
08/16/1994
ORDER vacating this Court's Order of 8/5/94; granting [11-1] motion for court order requiring US Dept of Labor to release workers' compensation records; that the U.S. Deptment of Labor deliver files on Jimmy T. Dickerson and Matthew Hutton to Hon. Ronald Davenport, the attorney for the defendant, Cushman, Inc. as further set out in the order; that upon receipt of the records by counsel for defendant Cushman, Inc., the records shall be made available to counsel for the plaintiffs upon their payment of the reasonable cost of copying the records (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed.
14
09/06/1994
ORDER, set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 1:00 10/14/94 before Judge Ira De Ment ; Proposed Pretrial Order due 10/7/94 ; Jury Trial set for 12/5/94 before Judge Ira De Ment ; (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Ridge, Marie.
17
09/16/1994
ORDER terminating [15-1] motion to Modify [7-1] order; allowing the Ft. Rucker Department of Public Works to use the Cushman truckster; granting [15-2] motion to permit use of vehicle (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed.
18
09/29/1994
MOTION by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton, Cushman, Inc., TIECO, Inc. to Extend Time for discovery referred to Judge Ira De Ment (war) Modified on 09/30/1994
19
09/30/1994
Witness list by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton, referred to Judge DeMent.
10/03/1994
Stamped ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time for discovery, and date for exchange of witness and exhibit lists, reset Discovery and date for exchange of witness and exhibit lists deadline to 11/15/94 (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed. (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
10/03/1994
MOTION by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton to continue trial referred to Judge Ira De Ment
21
10/05/1994
ANSWER to Complaint by Cushman, Inc. (Attorney Ronald Davenport), referred to Judge Ira De Ment
22
10/12/1994
ORDER granting plaintiffs' 10/3/94 motion to continue; resetting Pretrial Conference for 2/21/95 before Judge Ira De Ment; Motion Filing deadline on 12/27/94 ; Discovery cutoff 2/7/95 ; jury trial set for 4/10/95 before Judge Ira De Ment ; (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, RL. (dkt clerk)
23
10/12/1994
MOTION by TIECO, Inc. to Compel Dr. Robert J. Nolan, to produce records pertaining to the plaintiff, Matthew Hutton (w/attachments) referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
10/27/1994
Stamped ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Ridge. (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
10/27/1994
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Huttonagainst Kuker-Parker Industr amending [1-1] complaint; jury demand, referred to Judge DeMent.
25
10/27/1994
ORDER denying as moot [23-1] motion to Compel Dr. Robert J. Nolan, to produce records pertaining to the plaintiff, Matthew Hutton (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel.
26
11/21/1994
SUMMONS issued for Kuker-Parker Industr; summons, complaint, lst amended complaint and 2nd complaint mailed to said defendant cmrrr.
27
12/06/1994
ANSWER by Kuker-Parker Industr (Attorney Donald R. Jones Jr., Sterling G. Culpepper Jr.) to 2nd amended complaint referred to Judge Ira De Ment
28
01/06/1995
ORDER, set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 10:40 2/21/95 before Judge Ira De Ment ; Proposed Pretrial Order due 2/14/95 ; Jury Trial set for 4/10/95 before Judge Ira De Ment ; (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Ridge, Marie.
29
01/17/1995
MOTION by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton, Cushman, Inc., TIECO, Inc., Kuker-Parker Industries to Extend Time for discovery referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
30
01/19/1995
MOTION by Kuker-Parker Ind. to continue trial referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
31
01/20/1995
ORDER granting [29-1] motion to Extend Time for discovery, reset Discovery deadline to 2/10/95 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL. (dkt clerk)
32
01/26/1995
ORDER denying [30-1] motion to continue trial, reset Motion Filing deadline to 2/21/95 ; amending the Court's Order filed l/20/95 by string "February l0, l995" and substituting "February 2l, l995" (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Ridge.
34
01/31/1995
ORDER grainting the motion to amend the complaint; resetting Pretrial Conference for 10/12/95 before Judge Ira De Ment Discovery cutoff 9/28/95 ; jury trial set for 11/13/95 before Judge Ira De Ment ; that all dates in the Rule l6 Order shall be adjusted to comply with the new pretrial conference and trial dates (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Ridge, Marie, Brenda.
35
01/31/1995
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton against Solar Industries amending [1-1] complaint; jury demand
36
02/01/1995
SUMMONS issued for Solar Industries; summons, complaint, lst amended complaint, 2nd amended complaint, and 3rd amended complaint mailed to said defendant cmrrr.
37
02/01/1995
ORDER striking the second full paragraph of the Court Order entered on l/3l/95 and substituting paragraph changing pretrial and trial dates, reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 8/10/95 before Judge Ira De Ment ; Jury Trial set for 10/23/95 before Judge Ira De Ment ; ; that said order shall otherwise remain in full force and effect (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Ridge, Marie, Brenda.
38
02/02/1995
ANSWER by Cushman, Inc. (Attorney Ronald G. Davenport) to amended complaint referred to Judge Ira De Ment
39
02/06/1995
ANSWER by TIECO, Inc. (Attorney James B. Carlson) to 2nd amended complaint referred to Judge Ira De Ment
40
02/06/1995
ANSWER by TIECO, Inc. (Attorney James B. Carlson) to 3rd amended complaint referred to Judge Ira De Ment
41
02/09/1995
ANSWER (RESPONSE) by Kuker-Parker Ind. (Attorney Donald Jones) to amended complaint referred to Judge Ira De Ment
42
02/13/1995
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on Pat Bray on 2/6/95 for Solar Industries. Answer due on 2/26/95 for Solar Industries
43
02/21/1995
MOTION by Solar Industries for More Definite Statement referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
02/23/1995
Stamped ORDER denying [43-1] motion for More Definite Statement (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed. (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
03/03/1995
MOTION by Solar Industries to Amend the style of the complaint to reflect the correct party name (Upper Midwest Industries, Inc.'s assertion in answer filed 3/3/95 that it is erroneously named in the complaint as Solar Industries, Inc. CONSTRUED as a motion to amend the style of the complaint per order of 4/20/95.) (dkt clerk)
45
04/17/1995
MOTION by Kuker-Parker Ind. to Extend Time to file motion for summary judgment referred to Judge Ira De Ment
46
04/17/1995
MOTION by Solar Industries to Clarify date set for filing dispositive motions, to continue disposiitve motion cutoff date referred to Judge Ira De Ment
47
04/19/1995
AMENDED MOTION by Solar Industries to Clarify date set for filing dispositive motions, or to continue dispositive motion cutoff date referring to: [46-1] motion to Clarify date set for filing dispositive motions by Solar Industries, [46-2] motion to continue disposiitve motion cutoff date by Solar Industries referred to Judge Ira De Ment
48
04/20/1995
ORDER construing Upper Midwest Industries, Inc.'s assertion in its answer that it is erroneously named in the complaint as Solar Industries, Inc. as a motion to amend the style of the complaint to reflect the correct party name; that the plaintiffs SHOW CAUSE by 4/28/95 why said motion should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 4/28/95 for Matthew Hutton, for Jimmy T. Dickerson (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL. (dkt clerk)
49
04/21/1995
MOTION by TIECO, Inc. for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Ira De Ment
50
04/21/1995
MEMORANDUM BRIEF by TIECO, Inc. in support of [49-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Exhibits A-F maintained in seperate binder) referred to Judge Ira De Ment
51
04/24/1995
ORDER terminating [47-1] supplemental amended motion to Clarify date set for filing dispositive motions, that court's orders entered 5/l6/94 and l/3l/95 indicates that the dispositive motion deadline expried 75 days after the court's order issued l/3l/95 which waw 4/l7/95; granting [47-2] supplemental amended motion to continue dispositive motion cutoff date, reset Motion Filing deadline to 5/10/95 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed.
04/24/1995
Stamped ORDER granting [45-1] motion to Extend Time to file motion for summary judgment, reset Motion Filing deadline to 5/10/95 (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed. (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
04/24/1995
ORDER [49-1] motion for Summary Judgment by TIECO, Inc. set for submission on 5/9/95 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed.
53
04/28/1995
MOTION by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton to Extend Time to file evidentiary materials in opposition to Defendant Tieco, Inc's pending motion for summary judgment referred to Judge Ira De Ment
05/02/1995
Stamped ORDER granting [53-1] motion to Extend Time including 5/l9/95 to file evidentiary materials in opposition to Defendant Tieco, Inc's pending motion for summary judgment (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed. (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
05/03/1995
MOTION by TIECO, Inc. to Amend [49-1] motion for Summary Judgment by TIECO, Inc. referred to Judge Ira De Ment
05/05/1995
Stamped ORDER granting [54-1] motion to Amend [49-1] motion for Summary Judgment by TIECO, Inc. (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed. (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
05/05/1995
AMENDMENT to MOTION by TIECO, Inc. for Summary Judgment referring to: [49-1] motion for Summary Judgment by TIECO, Inc. (Exhibits A-B attached) referred to Judge Ira De Ment
56
05/10/1995
MEMORANDUM by Kuker-Parker Ind. in support of [56-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Kuker-Parker Ind. (Exhibit A attached; deposition transcript of Bryan Durig maintained in separate binder), referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
57
05/10/1995
MOTION by Solar Industries (Upper Midwest Industries, Inc.) for Summary Judgment, (Exhibits B-E attached), referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
58
05/10/1995
BRIEF by Solar Industries in support of [57-1] motion for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
59
05/12/1995
ORDER [57-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Solar Industries set for submission on 5/26/95, [56-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Kuker-Parker Ind. set for submission on 5/26/95, set plaintiff's Brief deadline to 5/26/95 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL. (dkt clerk)
60
05/12/1995
RESPONSE by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton to [49-1] motion for Summary Judgment by TIECO, Inc. (Depositions maintained in seperate binder) referred to Judge Ira De Ment
61
05/18/1995
MOTION by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton to Extend Time l0 days to respond to the motions for summary judgment of Defendant Kuker-Parker Industries, Inc., and Upper Midwest Industries, Inc. referred to Judge Ira De Ment
62
05/18/1995
MOTION by TIECO, Inc. to Strike the affidavit of Bryan R. During, Ph.D., P.E. filed in support of plaintiffs' response to motion for summary judgment referred to Judge Ira De Ment
05/18/1995
Stamped ORDER granting [61-1] motion to Extend Time l0 days to respond to the motions for summary judgment of Defendant Kuker-Parker Industries, Inc., and Upper Midwest Industries, Inc., Response to Motion reset to 5/30/95 for [57-1] motion for Summary Judgment, reset to 5/30/95 for [56-1] motion for Summary Judgment (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed. (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
05/19/1995
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why defendant Tieco, Inc.'s motion to strike filed 5/l8/95 should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 6/1/95 for Matthew Hutton, for Jimmy T. Dickerson (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed.
64
05/30/1995
MOTION by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton to allow supplementation of response to defendant Upper Midwest Industries, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment (Exhibit A attached) referred to Judge Ira De Ment
65
05/30/1995
RESPONSE by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton to [56-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Kuker-Parker Ind. referred to Judge Ira De Ment
66
05/30/1995
RESPONSE by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton to [57-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Solar Industries referred to Judge Ira De Ment
67
05/30/1995
Materials submitted by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton in opposition to [57-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [56-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [49-1] motion for Summary Judgment (w/attachments) referred to Judge Ira De Ment
68
05/31/1995
Response by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton to [63-1] Order to Show Cause Re: Motion to Strike Affidavit referred to Judge Ira De Ment
69
06/05/1995
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (rendered 6/5/95) why defendant Upper Midwest Industries, Inc. (Solar Industries) has not timely responded to the plaintiffs' first request for production of documents and interrogatories: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 6/8/95 for Solar Industries (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed. (war) Modified on 06/05/1995
70
06/08/1995
RESPONSE by Solar Industries in opposition to [64-1] motion to allow supplementation of response to defendant Upper Midwest Industries, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment by Matthew Hutton, Jimmy T. Dickerson referred to Judge Ira De Ment
71
06/23/1995
MOTION by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton to Extend Time For Filing Supplemental Response to Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Upper Midwest Industries, Inc. ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
72
06/28/1995
ORDER, set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 1:40 8/8/95 before Judge Ira De Ment ; Proposed Pretrial Order due 8/1/95 ; Jury Trial set for 10/23/95 before Judge Ira De Ment ; (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT and RL. (dkt clerk)
73
07/18/1995
AMENDMENT MOTION by TIECO, Inc. to Strike referring to: [62-1] motion to Strike the affidavit of Bryan R. During, Ph.D., P.E. filed in support of plaintiffs' response to motion for summary judgment by TIECO, Inc. (w/attachments); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
74
07/18/1995
MOTION by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton to continue trial setting ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
75
07/19/1995
ORDER that defendant's name Solar Industries, Inc. be amended to reflect the correct company name UPPER MIDWEST INDUSTRIES, INC. ; terminating [44-1] motion to Amend the style of the complaint to reflect the correct party name (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL. (dmk) Modified on 07/19/1995
76
07/20/1995
Witness list by TIECO, Inc. ; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 07/24/1995
77
07/21/1995
MEMORANDUM by TIECO, Inc. in support of [77-1] motion for leave to Amend [49-1] motion for Summary Judgment by TIECO, Inc. by TIECO, Inc. (w/attachments); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
78
07/24/1995
MOTION by Upper Midwest Indus. to Extend Witness Exchange and Discovery Deadlines ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
07/24/1995
Stamped ORDER granting [78-1] motion to Extend Witness Exchange and Discovery Deadlines to and including 9/15/95; resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery cutoff to 9/15/95 ; (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
07/27/1995
Witness list by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton; referred to Judge De Ment.
80
07/27/1995
Witness list by Kuker-Parker Ind.; referred to Judge De Ment.
81
07/27/1995
RESPONSE by TIECO, Inc. to [74-1] motion to continue trial setting by Matthew Hutton, Jimmy T. Dickerson referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
82
07/28/1995
RESPONSE (Objection) by Cushman, Inc. in opposition to [74-1] motion to continue trial setting by Matthew Hutton, Jimmy T. Dickerson ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
83
07/31/1995
ORDER, setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 1:40 8/8/95, in chambers in Montgomery, AL, before Judge Ira De Ment ; Proposed Pretrial Order due 8/3/95 ; (signed by Judge De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL, MT.
85
08/01/1995
ORDER that order entered 7/24/95 applies to Upper Midewest Industries, Inc. extending discovery and witness list exchange deadline to and including 9/15/95; that all other parties comply with 7/27/95 deadline for discovery and witness exchange; terminating [84-1] motion to Clarify [0-0] order resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery cutoff to 9/15/95 ;, resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: cutoff to 7/27/95 ; (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel.
86
08/02/1995
Witness list by Cushman, Inc.; referred to Judge De Ment.
87
08/04/1995
MOTION by Cushman, Inc. for Leave to File Amended Answer (Exhibit A attached); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
08/04/1995
Received proposed pretrial order; referred to Judge De Ment. (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
08/07/1995
MOTION by Upper Midwest Indus. for Leave to File Amended Answer (Proposed Amended Answer attached as Exhibit A); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
89
08/08/1995
MOTION by Kuker-Parker Ind. for Leave to File Amended Answer (Proposed Amended Answer attached as Exhibit A) ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
08/08/1995
Pre-Trial Conference held before Judge Ira De Ment on 8/8/95 (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/1995
Stamped ORDER granting [88-1] motion for Leave to File Amended Answer (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
90
08/09/1995
PRETRIAL ORDER setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury selection set for 10:00 10/23/95 Jury Trial set for 10/23/95 before Judge Ira De Ment ; voir dire questions due 10/13/95 proposed jury instructions due on 10/13/95, setting pretrial Brief deadline to 10/13/95 ; motions in limine deadline 10/13/95; that this order shall be binding on all parties unless modified by order of the court (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, RL, BA. AMENDED PER ORDER DATED 10/16/95 (dmk) Modified on 10/16/1995
91
08/09/1995
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Upper Midwest Indus. : amends [44-1] answer by Solar Industries
08/10/1995
Stamped ORDER granting [89-1] motion for Leave to File Amended Answer (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/1995
Stamped ORDER granting [87-1] motion for Leave to File Amended Answer (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
92
08/10/1995
MOTION by TIECO, Inc. for Leave to File Amended Answer (Proposed Amended Answer attached as Exhibit A); referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dmk) Modified on 08/14/1995
93
08/10/1995
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Cushman, Inc. : amends [38-1] complaint answer by Cushman, Inc. (dmk) Modified on 08/18/1995
94
08/10/1995
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Kuker-Parker Ind. : amends [41-1] complaint answer by Kuker-Parker Ind.
08/16/1995
Stamped ORDER granting [92-1] motion for Leave to File Amended Answer (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
95
08/16/1995
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by TIECO, Inc. : amends [5-1] answer by TIECO, Inc.
96
08/17/1995
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF AND EVIDENCE by Upper Midwest Indus. in support of [57-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Exhibits G-J attached); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
97
08/22/1995
Witness list by Upper Midwest Indus.; referred to Judge De Ment.
98
10/10/1995
Exhibit list by Kuker-Parker Ind.; referrred to Judge De Ment.
99
10/10/1995
Defendant Kuker-Parker Industries, Inc.'s Identification of Deposition Excerpts; referred to Judge De Ment.
100
10/10/1995
Requested Jury Charges by Kuker-Parker Ind. ; referred to Judge De Ment.
101
10/10/1995
TRIAL BRIEF by TIECO, Inc. (Exhibit A attached); referred to Judge De Ment.
102
10/10/1995
Proposed Jury Charges by TIECO, Inc.; referred to Judge De Ment.
103
10/10/1995
Requested Voir Dire Questions by TIECO, Inc. ; referred to Judge De Ment.
104
10/10/1995
Exhibit list by TIECO, Inc.; referred to Judge De Ment.
105
10/10/1995
Defendant Tieco, Inc. Intentions to Read Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories Provided by Kuker-Parker Industries, Inc.; referred to Judge De Ment.
106
10/10/1995
MOTION by TIECO, Inc. in Limine (w/attachment); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
107
10/10/1995
Defendant Tieco's designation of deposition testimony of Dr. James Bret Simpson; referred to Judge De Ment.
108
10/10/1995
Defendant Tieco's designation of deposition testimony of Dr. Steve Fendley; referred to Judge De Ment.
109
10/10/1995
Defendant Tieco's designation of deposition testimony of Robert Ewoldt; referred to Judge De Ment.
110
10/10/1995
Defendant Tieco's designation of deposition testimony of Matthew Hammon; referred to Judge De Ment.
111
10/10/1995
Defendant Tieco's designation of deposition testimony of Robert H. Turnbow; referred to Judge DeMent
112
10/10/1995
Defendant Tieco's designation of deposition testimony of Robert D. LeClaire; referred to Judge De Ment.
113
10/10/1995
Defendant Tieco's designation of deposition testimony of Ronald G. Watson; referred to Judge De Ment.
114
10/10/1995
Defendant Tieco's designation of deposition testimony of Robert W. Moore, Jr., M. D.; referred to Judge De Ment.
115
10/10/1995
Defendant Tieco's designation of deposition testimony of Karen Brock; referred to Judge De Ment.
116
10/10/1995
PRETRIAL BRIEF by Kuker-Parker Ind.; furnished to Judge De Ment.
117
10/10/1995
MOTION by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton in Limine referred to Judge Ira De Ment
118
10/10/1995
Requested Voir Dire Questions by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton; referred to Judge De Ment.
119
10/10/1995
Plaintiffs' Designation of Depositions To Be Used At Trial; referred to Judge De Ment.
120
10/10/1995
Exhibit list by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton; referred to Judge De Ment.
121
10/10/1995
Requested Jury Charges by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton; referred to Judge De Ment.
122
10/10/1995
MOTION by Cushman, Inc. in Limine referred to Judge Ira De Ment
123
10/10/1995
MOTION by Cushman, Inc. To Preclude testimony of Dr. Gerald Sweeney ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
124
10/10/1995
Exhibit list by Cushman, Inc.; referred to Judge De Ment.
125
10/10/1995
Defendant Cushman, Inc.'s Designated Deposition Excerpts; referred to Judge De Ment.
126
10/10/1995
Voir Dire Questions by Cushman, Inc.; referred to Judge De Ment.
127
10/10/1995
Requested Jury Charges by Cushman, Inc.; referred to Judge De Ment.
128
10/10/1995
Exhibit list and Deposition Excerpts by Upper Midwest Indus.; referred to Judge De Ment.
129
10/10/1995
Requested Voir Dire Questions by Kuker-Parker Ind.; referred to Judge De Ment.
130
10/11/1995
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why plaintiffs' motion in limine should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 10/16/95 for Upper Midwest Indus., for Kuker-Parker Ind., for TIECO, Inc., for Cushman, Inc. (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL.
131
10/11/1995
MOTION by TIECO, Inc. to supplement motion to preclude plaintiffs' use of Dr. Gerald Sweeney at trial MOTION TO PRECLUDE CONSTRUED ALSO AS A MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE MOTION TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' USE OF DR. GERALD SWEENEY AT TRIAL PER ORDER DATED 10/16/95
132
10/12/1995
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying UMI's [57-1] motion for Summary Judgment, denying Kuker [56-1] motion for Summary Judgment, denying Tieco's [49-1] motion for Summary Judgment, denying Tieco's [55-1] supplemental amended motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel
133
10/12/1995
MOTION by Kuker-Parker Ind. To Preclude testimony of Dr. Gerald Sweeney ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
134
10/12/1995
Requested Jury Charges by Upper Midwest Indus.; referred to Judge De Ment.
135
10/12/1995
Requested Voir Dire Questions by Upper Midwest Indus.; referred to Judge De Ment
136
10/12/1995
MOTION by Upper Midwest Indus. in Limine referred to Judge Ira De Ment
137
10/13/1995
Defendant Tieco, Inc. Designation of Deposition Excerpts Charles W. Carlsen To Be Read at Trial; referred to Judge De Ment.
138
10/13/1995
Defendant Tieco, Inc. Designation of Deposition Excerpts of Robert J. Nolan, Ph.D. To Be Read at Trial ; referred to Judge De Ment.
139
10/16/1995
ORDER amending pretrial order of 8/9/95 resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: proposed jury instructions due on 10/17/95 voir dire questions due 10/17/95, setting Pre-Brief deadline to 10/17/95 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL.
140
10/16/1995
NOTICE of Objection to Exhibits Listed by Plaintiffs by TIECO, Inc.; referred to Judge De Ment.
141
10/16/1995
NOTICE of Objection to Excerpts Designated by Plaintiffs From the Deposition of Dr. Timothy Holt by TIECO, Inc. ; referred to Judge De Ment.
142
10/16/1995
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why defendants' motion to preclude should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 10/19/95 for Matthew Hutton, for Jimmy T. Dickerson ; granting [131-1] motion to supplement motion to preclude plaintiffs' use of Dr. Gerald Sweeney at trial to and including 10/17/95 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel.
143
10/16/1995
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why defendant Upper Midwest Industries, Inc.'s motion in limine should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 10/19/95 for Matthew Hutton, for Jimmy T. Dickerson (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL.
144
10/16/1995
Supplemental Exhibit list by Kuker-Parker Ind.; referred to Judge De Ment.
145
10/16/1995
TRIAL BRIEF by Upper Midwest Indus.; referred to Judge De Ment.
146
10/16/1995
NOTICE of Objections to Exhibits and Deposition Testimony Listed by Plaintiffs by Upper Midwest Indus.; referred to Judge De Ment.
147
10/16/1995
Response by Upper Midwest Indus. to [130-1] Order to Show Cause re: motion in limine (w/attachments); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
148
10/16/1995
Supplemental Requested Voir Dire Questions by Kuker-Parker Ind.; referred to Judge De Ment.
149
10/16/1995
AMENDED MOTION by Kuker-Parker Ind. to preclude referring to: [133-1] motion To Preclude testimony of Dr. Gerald Sweeney by Kuker-Parker Ind. ;referred to Judge Ira De Ment
150
10/16/1995
OBJECTION by Kuker-Parker Ind. to [119-1] Identification of Deposition Excerpts Designated by Plaintiffs; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
151
10/16/1995
Defendant Kuker-Parker Industries, Inc. Designates the Folowing Excerpts to Be Read at Trial In Response to the Plaintiffs' Designation of Various Excerpts to be Read at Trial; referred to Judge De Ment.
152
10/16/1995
TRIAL BRIEF by Cushman, Inc. ; referred to Judge De Ment.
153
10/16/1995
OBJECTIONS by Cushman, Inc. to [120-1] exhibits list by Matthew Hutton, Jimmy T. Dickerson referred to Judge Ira De Ment
154
10/16/1995
Response by Cushman, Inc. to [142-1] Order to Show Cause Concerning Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine re: testimony of Matthew Hammon or Ronald G. Watson; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
155
10/16/1995
Plaintiffs Designate The Following Excerpts To Be Read At Trial From The Deposition Of Robert H. Turnbow In Response To Defendant's Designations; referred to Judge De Ment.
156
10/16/1995
Response by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton to [130-1] Order to Show Cause re: motions in limine; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
157
10/16/1995
Plaintiffs' Designation of Depositions Excerpts of Matthew Hammond and Ronald Watson In Response to Defendants' Designation; referred to Judge De Ment.
158
10/16/1995
OBJECTIONS by Kuker-Parker Ind. to [120-1] exhibits list by Matthew Hutton, Jimmy T. Dickerson referred to Judge Ira De Ment
159
10/17/1995
AMENDED MOTION by TIECO, Inc. to Preclude Plaintiffs Use of Dr. Gerald Sweeney at Trial referring to: [131-1] motion To Preclude Plaintiffs Use of Dr. Gerald Sweeney at Trial by TIECO, Inc. (w/attachment); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
160
10/17/1995
AMENDED Proposed Jury Charges by TIECO, Inc. ; referred to Judge De Ment.
161
10/17/1995
MOTION by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton to Compel defendant to answer certified questions (w/attachment); referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody
162
10/17/1995
TRIAL BRIEF by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton; referred to Judge De Ment.
163
10/17/1995
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton by LaBarron N. Boone
164
10/17/1995
MOTION by Cushman, Inc. in Limine referred to Judge Ira De Ment
165
10/18/1995
AMENDED NOTICE of Objection to Exhibits Listed by Plaintiffs by TIECO, Inc.; referred to Judge De Ment.
166
10/18/1995
AMENDED MOTION by TIECO, Inc. to preclude plaintiffs use of Dr. Gerald Sweeney at trial referring to: [131-1] motion To Preclude Plaintiffs Use of Dr. Gerald Sweeney at Trial by TIECO, Inc. (w/attachments); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
167
10/19/1995
Defendant UMI Designation of Additional Deposition Excerpts to Be Used at Trial In Response to Deposition Excerpts Designated by Plaintiffs and Others; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
168
10/19/1995
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant UMI's Objections to The Use of Certain Deposition Testimony; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
169
10/19/1995
Amendment Exhibit list by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton ; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
170
10/19/1995
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Cushman, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
171
10/19/1995
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Kuker-Parker's Objection to the Identification of Deposition Excerpts Designated by Plaintiffs; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
172
10/19/1995
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Tieco, Inc.'s Objection to Plaintiffs' Deposition Excerpts of Dr. Timothy N. Holt; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
173
10/19/1995
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Upper Midwest Industries, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
174
10/19/1995
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Tieco, Inc.'s Amended Notice of Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
175
10/20/1995
Defendant Tieco, Inc,'s Objection to Plaintiffs' Amendment to Exhibit List Adding Exhibit #283 and Plaintiffs' Exhibits 36, 127(ff) and 136 (w/attachments; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
176
10/20/1995
Defendant UMI's Objection to Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List and to Deposition Testimony of Dr. Timothy A. Holt; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
177
10/20/1995
Defendant UMI's Amended List of Deposition Testimony; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
178
10/20/1995
Defendant Kuker Parker Industries, Inc. Amended List of Deposition Testimony; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
179
10/20/1995
Defendant Kuker Parker Industries, Inc.'s Objection to Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List and to Deposition Testimony of Dr. Timothy A. Holt; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
180
10/20/1995
Response by Cushman, Inc. to (oral) Show Cause Order as to why plaintiffs' amendment to exhibit list should not be allowed; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
181
10/20/1995
Cushman, Inc.'s Amended List of Deposition Testimony; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
182
10/20/1995
Cushman, Inc.'s Objection to Deposition Testimony of Dr. Timothy A. Holt; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
183
10/20/1995
Defendant Kuker-Parker Industries, Inc. Second Objection to Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List, and to Deposition Testimony of Dr. Timothy A. Holt; referred to Judge De Ment.(dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
10/23/1995
Jury selection held before Judge Ira De Ment on 10/23/95 (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/1995
In-Chambers Conference held before Judge Ira De Ment on 10/23/95 with attorneys re: pending motions in limine (Text entry; no document attached.)
184
10/24/1995
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objections to Deposition Testimony of Dr. Timothy Holt; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
185
10/24/1995
Plaintiffs' Response to Objection of Tieco, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Exhibits 36, 127(ff), 136 and 283; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
187
10/26/1995
Proposed Supplemental Requested Jury Charges by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton ; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
188
10/27/1995
Defendant Tieco, Inc. designation of excerpts of Deposition of Dr. Timothy A. Holt Taken 10/18/95; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
189
10/27/1995
Defendant Tieco, Inc.'s Objection to Deposition Testimony of Dr. Timothy A. Holt; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
190
10/27/1995
MOTION by TIECO, Inc. for Leave to Amend Pleadings ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
191
10/27/1995
Second Amendment Exhibit list by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
192
10/27/1995
Third Amendment Exhibit list by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton ; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
10/30/1995
Jury Trial held before Judge Ira De Ment on 10/30/95-11/3/95 (Text entry; no document attached.)
193
10/30/1995
AFFIDAVIT of Kirk Reimers by Cushman, Inc. Re: opposition to one of plaintiff's exhibits (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
194
10/30/1995
Supplemental Jury Charges by TIECO, Inc. ; referred to Judge De Ment. (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
195
11/01/1995
MOTION by Cushman, Inc. for Directed Verdict At The Close of the Plaintiffs' Case (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
196
11/01/1995
MOTION by TIECO, Inc. For Judgment As A Matter Of Law ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
197
11/02/1995
Defendants Cushman and Tieco, Inc. Proposed Jury Verdict Form filed in open court - GRANTED per Judge De Ment. 11/3/95 (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
198
11/02/1995
MOTION by Cushman, Inc. for Directed Verdict At The Close Of All The Evidence (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
199
11/02/1995
MOTION by TIECO, Inc. for Judgment As A Matter Of Law (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
200
11/03/1995
JURY VERDICT for Cushman, Inc., TIECO, Inc. against plaintiff Jimmy T. Dickerson (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
201
11/03/1995
JURY VERDICT for Cushman, Inc., TIECO, Inc. against plaintiff Matthew Hutton (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
202
11/06/1995
Courtroom Deputy's MINUTES of proceedings: 10/23/95 - Jury Selection held. 10/23/95 - In Chambers Conference w/attorneys re: pending motions in limine. 10/30/95 - Jury Trial commences; affidavit of Kirk Reimers filed by defendant Cushman in opposition to one of plaintiff's exhibits. 10/31/95 - Jury trial reconvenes. Plaintiffs file oral motion to reconsider motion in limine. 11/1/95 - Jury reconvenes. Defendant Cushman files motion for directed verdict at the close of plaintiffs' case - DENIED. Defendant Tieco files motion for judgment as a matter of law - DENIED. 11/2/95 - Jury trial reconvenes. Defendants' file proposed jury verdict form - GRANTED. 11/2/95 - Defendant Cushman files motion for judgment as a matter of law at close of all evidence - DENIED. 11/2/95 - Defendant Tieco files motion for judgment as a matter of law at close of all evidence - DENIED. 11/3/95 - Jury trial reconvenes. 11/3/95 - Jury verdicts for defendants filed. Court adjourned. Denying [197-1] motion for Judgment As A Matter Of Law, denying [196-1] motion for Directed Verdict At The Close Of All The Evidence, denying [194-1] motion For Judgment As A Matter Law, denying [193-1] motion for Directed Verdict At The Close of the Plaintiffs' Case. (Witness and Exhibit lists attached). (dmk) Modified on 11/08/1995
203
11/17/1995
JUDGMENT (rendered 11/16/95) for Cushman, Inc., TIECO, Inc. against Matthew Hutton and plaintiff take nothing by said suit; that costs be taxed against plaintiff (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, RL.
204
11/17/1995
JUDGMENT for Cushman, Inc., TIECO, Inc. against Jimmy T. Dickerson and plaintiff take nothing by said suit; that costs be taxed against plaintiff (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, RL.
11/17/1995
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
205
11/27/1995
MOTION by Jimmy T. Dickerson, Matthew Hutton for New Trial referred to Judge Ira De Ment
206
12/05/1995
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why plaintiffs' motion for new trial should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 12/20/95 for Upper Midwest Indus., for Kuker-Parker Ind., for TIECO, Inc., for Cushman, Inc. (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL.
207
12/11/1995
Response by TIECO, Inc. to [206-1] Order to Show Cause re: motion for new trial; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
208
12/11/1995
Response by Cushman, Inc. to [206-1] Order to Show Cause re: motion for new trial (w/attachments); referred to Judge Ira De Ment (ydw) Modified on 12/12/1995
12/13/1995
Stamped ORDER denying [205-1] motion for New Trial (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2000
Exhibits destroyed 5/15/00. No response by parties to letters mailed 30 days prior to destruction. The Judge assigned has indicated that the exhibits are of no historical value. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.