Didi Kim Taylor and Donald Scott Taylor
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00336 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/04/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/04/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
10/04/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
10/04/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
10/04/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
10/04/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
10/05/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
10/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
10/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
10/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
10/09/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
10/30/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
10/30/2018
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
11/14/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
16
11/14/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
11/14/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
11/14/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.