Dietz-Clark v. Allstate Insurance Company
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00195 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/04/2018
Notice of Removal
2
09/04/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
09/04/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
4
09/05/2018
Notice of Service List
5
09/05/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
6
10/02/2018
Answer to Complaint
7
10/02/2018
Jury Demand
8
10/02/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
9
10/23/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
10
10/24/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
11
01/28/2019
Order
12
02/06/2019
Witness List
13
02/11/2019
Witness List

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.