Dion Fitzgerald Wynne and Freida Lynn Lampkin-Wynne
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00074 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/09/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
03/09/2019
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
03/09/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
4
03/09/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
03/09/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
03/11/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
03/11/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
03/11/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
03/11/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
8
03/11/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
9
03/11/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
10
03/12/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
11
03/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
03/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
03/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
03/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
03/14/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
16
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
17
03/18/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
18
03/18/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
19
03/20/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
20
03/21/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
21
04/02/2019
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
22
04/10/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
23
04/10/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
24
04/10/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
25
04/10/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
26
04/10/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
27
04/10/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
28
04/10/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
04/11/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
04/15/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
30
04/15/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
31
04/16/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
04/16/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
04/16/2019
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
33
04/16/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
04/17/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
04/17/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
35
04/18/2019
Proceeding Memo
36
04/18/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
37
04/19/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
38
04/19/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
39
04/19/2019
Certificate of Service
40
04/22/2019
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.