Disability Law Center of Alaska et al v. Valerie Davidson, et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00277 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
48
03/28/2018
ORDER denying 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 3/28/18.
53
06/15/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
54
06/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
55
06/27/2018
Notice of Settlement
56
06/28/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
57
07/26/2018
Settlement Agreement
58
08/01/2018
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.