Discher v. Commissioner of Social Security
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cv-00006 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/01/2018
Complaint
2
06/01/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
06/01/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
06/01/2018
Unissued Summons
5
06/04/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
6
06/04/2018
Notice (Other)
7
06/08/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
06/08/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
06/12/2018
Notice of Appearance
10
06/18/2018
Notice (Other)
11
06/21/2018
Notice of Appearance
12
06/22/2018
Order
06/22/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
07/13/2018
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
14
08/28/2018
Answer to Complaint
15
08/28/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
16
09/27/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.