Doe v. Lt. Gen. Franklin Lee Hagenbec
Court Docket Sheet

2nd Circuit Court of Appeals

2015-01890 (ca2)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/11/2015
NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, FILED. [1531420] [15-1890] [Entered: 06/12/2015 11:50 AM]
2
06/11/2015
DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/13/2015, RECEIVED.[1531434] [15-1890] [Entered: 06/12/2015 11:54 AM]
3
06/11/2015
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1531436] [15-1890] [Entered: 06/12/2015 11:55 AM]
6
06/18/2015
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, FILED. Service date 06/18/2015 by CM/ECF. [1535654] [15-1890] [Entered: 06/18/2015 02:50 PM]
8
06/18/2015
ATTORNEY, Benjamin H. Torrance for Franklin Lee Hagenbeck, William E. Rapp, in case 15-1890, [6], ADDED.[1535683] [15-1890] [Entered: 06/18/2015 03:11 PM]
9
06/25/2015
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, FILED. Service date 06/25/2015 by CM/ECF.[1540964] [15-1890] [Entered: 06/25/2015 06:15 PM]
10
06/25/2015
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, FILED. Service date 06/25/2015 by CM/ECF.[1540965] [15-1890] [Entered: 06/25/2015 06:17 PM]
11
06/25/2015
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, FILED. Service date 06/25/2015 by CM/ECF.[1540966] [15-1890] [Entered: 06/25/2015 06:18 PM]
15
06/29/2015
NEW CASE MANAGER, Ahronda Crossman, ASSIGNED.[1542004] [15-1890] [Entered: 06/29/2015 08:19 AM]
16
06/29/2015
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 06/29/2015 by CM/ECF.[1542928] [15-1890] [Entered: 06/29/2015 04:07 PM]
17
07/09/2015
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, informing Court of proposed due date 09/24/2015, RECEIVED. Service date 07/09/2015 by CM/ECF.[1550027] [15-1890] [Entered: 07/09/2015 01:43 PM]
20
07/09/2015
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp Brief due date as 09/24/2015; Joint Appendix due date as 09/24/2015, FILED.[1550206] [15-1890]--[Edited 05/11/2017 by AC] [Entered: 07/09/2015 03:33 PM]
22
07/31/2015
MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, FILED. Service date 07/31/2015 by CM/ECF. [1567117] [15-1890] [Entered: 07/31/2015 06:12 PM]
24
08/04/2015
LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, RECEIVED. Service date 08/04/2015 by email, CM/ECF.[1569075] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/04/2015 04:10 PM]
25
08/04/2015
OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to stay [22], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 08/04/2015 by CM/ECF. [1569223] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/04/2015 06:34 PM]
26
08/04/2015
MOTION, to change venue, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 08/04/2015 by email, CM/ECF. [1569232] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/04/2015 06:53 PM]
35
08/06/2015
MOTION ORDER, referring motion to stay [22] filed by Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp; referring motion to change venue [26] filed by Appellee Jane Doe, by RCW, FILED. [1570228][35] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/06/2015 08:26 AM]
36
08/06/2015
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 08/06/2015, to U.S. District Court Southern District of New York, ISSUED.[1570232] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/06/2015 08:33 AM]
37
08/14/2015
OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to change venue [26], on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, FILED. Service date 08/14/2015 by CM/ECF. [1577160] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/14/2015 04:07 PM]
41
08/21/2015
REPLY TO OPPOSITION [37], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 08/21/2015 by CM/ECF.[1581998][41] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/21/2015 12:20 PM]
47
08/26/2015
ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1585601] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/26/2015 03:35 PM]
48
08/28/2015
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 08/28/2015 by CM/ECF. [1587236] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/28/2015 11:14 AM]
49
08/28/2015
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of appearance, [48], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED.[1587291] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/28/2015 11:42 AM]
50
08/28/2015
LOCAL RULE 46(e) AUTHORIZATION FOR LAW STUDENTS: Kathryn Wynbrandt representing Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 08/28/2015 by CM/ECF.[1587333] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/28/2015 12:05 PM]
51
08/31/2015
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [49], [50], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED.[1588037] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/31/2015 10:09 AM]
53
09/01/2015
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 46(e) form, [50], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED.[1589072] [15-1890] [Entered: 09/01/2015 11:35 AM]
54
09/01/2015
MOTION, to assist counsel of record, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 09/01/2015 by CM/ECF. [1589717] [15-1890] [Entered: 09/01/2015 05:03 PM]
55
09/02/2015
CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION [53], [54], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED.[1589826] [15-1890] [Entered: 09/02/2015 09:04 AM]
59
09/03/2015
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, RECEIVED. Service date 09/03/2015 by CM/ECF.[1590864] [15-1890] [Entered: 09/03/2015 09:47 AM]
60
09/03/2015
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to permit law student to appear at oral argument, [54] filed by Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. [1591328][60] [15-1890] [Entered: 09/03/2015 02:01 PM]
61
09/04/2015
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 09/04/1981 by CM/ECF. [1592515] [15-1890] [Entered: 09/04/2015 03:29 PM]
62
09/08/2015
ATTORNEY, Michael Joel Wishnie for Jane Doe, in case 15-1890, [61], ADDED.[1592883] [15-1890] [Entered: 09/08/2015 10:01 AM]
65
09/10/2015
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to stay [22] filed by Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp; denying motion to change venue [26] filed by Appellee Jane Doe, by GEL, RJL, FILED. [1595116][65] [15-1890] [Entered: 09/10/2015 11:53 AM]
67
09/24/2015
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, informing Court of proposed due date 12/10/2015, RECEIVED. Service date 09/24/2015 by CM/ECF.[1605687] [15-1890] [Entered: 09/24/2015 09:41 AM]
70
09/24/2015
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp Brief due date as 12/10/2015;. Joint Appendix due date as 12/10/2015, FILED.[1606098] [15-1890] [Entered: 09/24/2015 01:39 PM]
71
12/10/2015
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, FILED. Service date 12/10/2015 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1661147] [15-1890] [Entered: 12/10/2015 02:59 PM]
72
12/10/2015
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-68), on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, FILED. Service date 12/10/2015 by US mail.[1661162] [15-1890] [Entered: 12/10/2015 03:04 PM]
73
12/10/2015
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, informing Court of proposed due date 03/10/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 12/10/2015 by CM/ECF.[1661321] [15-1890] [Entered: 12/10/2015 04:02 PM]
76
12/14/2015
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Jane Doe Brief due date as 03/10/2016, FILED.[1662757] [15-1890] [Entered: 12/14/2015 10:02 AM]
84
03/03/2016
NEW CASE MANAGER, Kryzia Molina, ASSIGNED.[1717682] [15-1890]--[Edited 03/10/2016 by JT] [Entered: 03/03/2016 09:52 AM]
85
03/10/2016
ATTORNEY, Bethany Yue Ping Li for Jane Doe, in case 15-1890, [61], ADDED.[1723736] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/10/2016 10:44 AM]
86
03/10/2016
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 03/10/2016 by CM/ECF. [1723891] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/10/2016 12:16 PM]
87
03/10/2016
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief, [86], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED.[1724169] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/10/2016 03:06 PM]
88
03/10/2016
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 03/10/2016 by CM/ECF. [1724277] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/10/2016 03:55 PM]
89
03/15/2016
CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [88], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED.[1727291] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/15/2016 11:33 AM]
92
03/16/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, University Administrators, FILED. Service date 03/16/2016 by CM/ECF. [1728322] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/16/2016 09:40 AM]
93
03/16/2016
NEW PARTY, Movant University Administrators, ADDED.[1728807] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/16/2016 01:40 PM]
94
03/16/2016
MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Movant University Administrators, FILED. Service date 03/16/2016 by CM/ECF. [1728839] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/16/2016 01:55 PM]
97
03/16/2016
OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to extend time [94], on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, FILED. Service date 03/16/2016 by CM/ECF. [1729356] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/16/2016 05:26 PM]
100
03/17/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Association of University Women, Human Rights and Gender Justice Clinic at the City University of New York School of Law, Human Rights Watch, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Center on Domestic and Sexual Violence, and National Women’s Law Center, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1729915] [15-1890]--[Edited 03/24/2016 by KM] [Entered: 03/17/2016 11:55 AM]
101
03/17/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Association of University Women, Human Rights and Gender Justice Clinic at the City University of New York School of Law, Human Rights Watch, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Center on Domestic and Sexual Violence, and National Women’s Law Center, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1729927] [15-1890]--[Edited 03/24/2016 by KM] [Entered: 03/17/2016 11:59 AM]
102
03/17/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Association of University Women, Human Rights and Gender Justice Clinic at the City University of New York School of Law, Human Rights Watch, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Center on Domestic and Sexual Violence, and National Women’s Law Center, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1729957] [15-1890]--[Edited 03/24/2016 by KM] [Entered: 03/17/2016 12:09 PM]
103
03/17/2016
AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Association of University Women, Human Rights and Gender Justice Clinic at the City University of New York School of Law, Human Rights Watch, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Center on Domestic and Sexual Violence, and National Women’s Law Center, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by US mail, CM/ECF. [1729974] [15-1890]--[Edited 03/24/2016 by KM] [Entered: 03/17/2016 12:18 PM]
104
03/17/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Former Military Officers, Ellen Haring, Mary Finch, Caroline Jacobs, Michelle Olson, Anuradha Bhagwati, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730525] [15-1890]--[Edited 03/25/2016 by KM]--[Edited 03/25/2016 by KM] [Entered: 03/17/2016 05:16 PM]
105
03/17/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Former Military Officers,Ellen Haring, Mary Finch, Caroline Jacobs, Michelle Olson, Anuradha Bhagwati, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730526] [15-1890]--[Edited 03/25/2016 by KM]--[Edited 03/25/2016 by KM] [Entered: 03/17/2016 05:18 PM]
106
03/17/2016
AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Former Military Officers, Ellen Haring, Mary Finch, Caroline Jacobs, Michelle Olson, Anuradha Bhagwati, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730528] [15-1890]--[Edited 03/25/2016 by KM] [Entered: 03/17/2016 05:20 PM]
107
03/17/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Jeffrey Lehman, Linda Koch Lorimer, Gregory S. Prince Jr., FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730544] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/17/2016 05:59 PM]
108
03/17/2016
AMICUS BRIEF, Jeffrey Lehman, Linda Koch Lorimer, Gregory S. Prince Jr., FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730548] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/17/2016 06:03 PM]
109
03/17/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Jeffrey Lehman, Linda Koch Lorimer, Gregory S. Prince Jr, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730549] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/17/2016 06:07 PM]
110
03/17/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Veterans Legal Services Program, Protect Our Defenders, and Service Women’s Action Network, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730573] [15-1890]--[Edited 03/25/2016 by KM] [Entered: 03/17/2016 08:07 PM]
111
03/17/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Veterans Legal Services Program, Protect Our Defenders, and Service Women’s Action Network, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730574] [15-1890]--[Edited 03/25/2016 by KM] [Entered: 03/17/2016 08:11 PM]
112
03/17/2016
AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of National Veterans Legal Services Program, Protect Our Defenders, and Service Women’s Action Network FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730575] [15-1890]--[Edited 03/25/2016 by KM] [Entered: 03/17/2016 08:16 PM]
113
03/17/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Michelle J. Anderson, Michael Asimow, Naomi R. Cahn, Erwin Chemerinsky, Robin Effron, Owen M. Fiss, Julie Goldscheid, Helen Hershkoff, Sylvia A. Law, Stephen Loffredo, David Marcus, Jerry L. Mashaw, Diane H. Mazur, Gillian E. Metzger, Burt Neuborne, Aziz Rana, Kermit Roosevelt, Michael D. Sant’Ambrogio, Joan E. Steinman, Stephen I. Vladeck, Adam Zimmerman, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730586] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/17/2016 11:00 PM]
114
03/17/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Michelle J. Anderson, Michael Asimow, Naomi R. Cahn, Erwin Chemerinsky, Robin Effron, Owen M. Fiss, Julie Goldscheid, Helen Hershkoff, Sylvia A. Law, Stephen Loffredo, David Marcus, Jerry L. Mashaw, Diane H. Mazur, Gillian E. Metzger, Burt Neuborne, Aziz Rana, Kermit Roosevelt, Michael D. Sant’Ambrogio, Joan E. Steinman, Stephen I. Vladeck, Adam Zimmerman, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730587] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/17/2016 11:05 PM]
115
03/17/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Michelle J. Anderson, Michael Asimow, Naomi R. Cahn, Erwin Chemerinsky, Robin Effron, Owen M. Fiss, Julie Goldscheid, Helen Hershkoff, Sylvia A. Law, Stephen Loffredo, David Marcus, Jerry L. Mashaw, Diane H. Mazur, Gillian E. Metzger, Burt Neuborne, Aziz Rana, Kermit Roosevelt, Michael D. Sant’Ambrogio, Joan E. Steinman, Stephen I. Vladeck, Adam Zimmerman, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730588] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/17/2016 11:14 PM]
116
03/17/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Michelle J. Anderson, Michael Asimow, Naomi R. Cahn, Erwin Chemerinsky, Robin Effron, Owen M. Fiss, Julie Goldscheid, Helen Hershkoff, Sylvia A. Law, Stephen Loffredo, David Marcus, Jerry L. Mashaw, Diane H. Mazur, Gillian E. Metzger, Burt Neuborne, Aziz Rana, Kermit Roosevelt, Michael D. Sant’Ambrogio, Joan E. Steinman, Stephen I. Vladeck, Adam Zimmerman, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730589] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/17/2016 11:20 PM]
117
03/17/2016
AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Michelle J. Anderson, Michael Asimow, Naomi R. Cahn, Erwin Chemerinsky, Robin Effron, Owen M. Fiss, Julie Goldscheid, Helen Hershkoff, Sylvia A. Law, Stephen Loffredo, David Marcus, Jerry L. Mashaw, Diane H. Mazur, Gillian E. Metzger, Burt Neuborne, Aziz Rana, Kermit Roosevelt, Michael D. Sant’Ambrogio, Joan E. Steinman, Stephen I. Vladeck, Adam Zimmerman, FILED. Service date 03/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1730593] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/17/2016 11:47 PM]
118
03/18/2016
MOTION, to withdraw document, on behalf of Movant University Administrators, FILED. Service date 03/18/2016 by CM/ECF. [1731229] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/18/2016 01:48 PM]
120
03/21/2016
CORRECTED, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 03/21/2016 by CM/ECF.[1732622] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/21/2016 03:51 PM]
121
03/21/2016
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, CORRECTED, [120], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED.[1732761] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/21/2016 04:43 PM]
122
03/21/2016
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, RECEIVED. Service date 03/21/2016 by CM/ECF.[1732781] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/21/2016 04:54 PM]
123
03/21/2016
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Michael Joel Wishnie for Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 03/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1732866] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/21/2016 07:28 PM]
124
03/22/2016
CURED DEFECTIVE LETTER RECEIVED, [122], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED.[1732920] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/22/2016 08:50 AM]
127
03/22/2016
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw document [118] filed by Movant University Administrators; granting motion to extend time [94] filed by Movant University Administrators, FILED. [1733027][127] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/22/2016 09:45 AM]
128
03/24/2016
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union, ADDED.[1735801] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/24/2016 03:55 PM]
129
03/24/2016
REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, FILED. Service date 03/24/2016 by CM/ECF. [1735957] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/24/2016 05:16 PM]
130
03/24/2016
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Christopher Kendrick Connolly for Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, FILED. Service date 03/24/2016 by CM/ECF. [1735958] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/24/2016 05:18 PM]
131
03/25/2016
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Caroline Jacobs, Michelle Olson and Anuradha Bhagwati, ADDED.[1736596] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/25/2016 03:42 PM]
132
03/25/2016
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae National Veterans Legal Services Program, Protect Our Defenders and Service Women's Action Network, ADDED.[1736676] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/25/2016 04:23 PM]
133
03/25/2016
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Michelle J. Anderson, Michael Asimow, Naomi R. Cahn, Erwin Chemerinsky, Robin Effron, Owen M. Fiss, Julie Goldscheid, Helen M. Hershkoff, Sylvia A. Law, Stephen Loffredo, David Marcus, Jerry L. Mashaw, Diane H. Mazur, Gillian E. Metzger, Burt Neuborne, Aziz Rana, Kermit Roosevelt, Michael D. Sant'Ambrogio, Joan E. Steinman, Stephen I. Vladeck and Adam Zimmerman, ADDED.[1736752] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/25/2016 05:09 PM]
134
03/28/2016
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Jeffrey Lehman, Linda Koch Lorimer and Gregory S. Prince Jr., ADDED.[1736880] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/28/2016 09:07 AM]
135
03/28/2016
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, [104], [105], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Anuradha Bhagwati, Mary Finch, Ellen Haring, Caroline Jacobs and Michelle Olson, FILED. [1736955] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/28/2016 09:43 AM]
136
03/28/2016
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, AMICUS BRIEF, [103], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Association of University Women, American Civil Liberties Union, Human Rights Watch, Human Rights and Gender Justice Clinic at the City University of New York School of Law, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Center on Domestic and Sexual Violence and National Women's Law Center, FILED.[1737216] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/28/2016 12:17 PM]
137
03/28/2016
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, AMICUS BRIEF, [106], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Anuradha Bhagwati, Mary Finch, Ellen Haring, Caroline Jacobs and Michelle Olson, FILED.[1737256] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/28/2016 12:35 PM]
141
03/28/2016
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, AMICUS BRIEF, [112], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Veterans Legal Services Program, Protect Our Defenders and Service Women's Action Network, FILED.[1737410] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/28/2016 02:44 PM]
144
03/28/2016
AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Association of University Women, Human Rights and Gender Justice Clinic at the City University of New York School of Law, Human Rights Watch, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Center on Domestic and Sexual Violence, and National Women’s Law Center, FILED. Service date 03/28/2016 by CM/ECF. [1737537] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/28/2016 03:46 PM]
146
03/29/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Amicus Curiae Anuradha Bhagwati, Mary Finch, Ellen Haring, Caroline Jacobs and Michelle Olson, FILED. Service date 03/29/2016 by CM/ECF. [1738357] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/29/2016 01:15 PM]
147
03/29/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Amicus Curiae Anuradha Bhagwati, Mary Finch, Ellen Haring, Caroline Jacobs and Michelle Olson, FILED. Service date 03/29/2016 by CM/ECF. [1738361] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/29/2016 01:18 PM]
148
03/29/2016
AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Anuradha Bhagwati, Mary Finch, Ellen Haring, Caroline Jacobs and Michelle Olson, FILED. Service date 03/29/2016 by CM/ECF. [1738375] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/29/2016 01:29 PM]
149
03/29/2016
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, [146], [147], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Anuradha Bhagwati, Mary Finch, Ellen Haring, Caroline Jacobs and Michelle Olson, FILED.[1738441] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/29/2016 02:19 PM]
150
03/29/2016
CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF, [148], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Anuradha Bhagwati, Mary Finch, Ellen Haring, Caroline Jacobs and Michelle Olson, FILED.[1738469] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/29/2016 02:43 PM]
152
03/29/2016
AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of National Veterans Legal Services Program, Protect Our Defenders and Service Women's Action Network, FILED. Service date 03/29/2016 by CM/ECF. [1738494] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/29/2016 03:04 PM]
153
03/30/2016
CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF, [152], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Veterans Legal Services Program, Protect Our Defenders and Service Women's Action Network, FILED.[1739007] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/30/2016 10:23 AM]
155
03/31/2016
CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 06/13/2016, A, PROPOSED.[1740381] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/31/2016 01:25 PM]
156
03/31/2016
CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF, [144], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Association of University Women, American Civil Liberties Union, Human Rights Watch, Human Rights and Gender Justice Clinic at the City University of New York School of Law, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Center on Domestic and Sexual Violence and National Women's Law Center, FILED.[1740568] [15-1890] [Entered: 03/31/2016 03:10 PM]
161
04/20/2016
LOCAL RULE 46(e) AUTHORIZATION FOR LAW STUDENTS: Jonas Wang representing Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 04/20/2016 by CM/ECF.[1754849] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/20/2016 04:04 PM]
162
04/20/2016
LOCAL RULE 46(e) AUTHORIZATION FOR LAW STUDENTS: Erin Baldwin, Rebecca Ojserkis, Jonas Wang, Kathryn Wynbrandt representing Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 04/20/2016 by CM/ECF.[1754860] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/20/2016 04:09 PM]
163
04/20/2016
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LOCAL RULE 46(e) AUTHORIZATION FOR LAW STUDENTS, [161], [162], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED.[1754934] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/20/2016 05:10 PM]
164
04/21/2016
LOCAL RULE 46(e) AUTHORIZATION FOR LAW STUDENTS: Jonas Wang representing Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 04/21/2016 by CM/ECF.[1755939] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/21/2016 05:28 PM]
165
04/22/2016
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LOCAL RULE 46(e) AUTHORIZATION FOR LAW STUDENTS, [164], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED.[1756363] [15-1890]--[Edited 04/22/2016 by KM] [Entered: 04/22/2016 11:49 AM]
166
04/25/2016
CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 06/16/2016, A-Panel, SET.[1757700] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/25/2016 03:15 PM]
167
04/25/2016
MOTION, to assist counsel of record, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 04/25/2016 by CM/ECF. [1757886] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/25/2016 04:39 PM]
168
04/25/2016
MOTION, to assist counsel of record, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 04/25/2016 by CM/ECF. [1757895] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/25/2016 04:41 PM]
169
04/25/2016
MOTION, to assist counsel of record, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 04/25/2016 by CM/ECF. [1757898] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/25/2016 04:42 PM]
171
04/26/2016
CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION to assist counsel of record, [167], [168], [169], on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED.[1758250] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/26/2016 10:26 AM]
174
04/27/2016
MOTION ORDER, granting motion for leave for law student Erin Baldwin, Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization; Yale Law School, PO Box 209090, New Haven, CT 06511, 937-286-1203 to appear in this matter [169] filed by Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. [1759266][174] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/27/2016 10:12 AM]
175
04/27/2016
MOTION ORDER, granting motion for leave for law student Rebecca Ojserkis Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization; Yale Law School, PO Box 209090, New Haven, CT 06511, 937-286-1203 to appear in this matter [168] filed by Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. [1759270][175] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/27/2016 10:13 AM]
176
04/27/2016
MOTION ORDER, granting motion for leave for law student Jonas Wang Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization; Yale Law School, PO Box 209090, New Haven, CT 06511, 937-286-1203 to appear in this matter [167] filed by Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. [1759278][176] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/27/2016 10:17 AM]
177
04/27/2016
LAW STUDENT, Kathryn Wynbrandt for Jane Doe, in case 15-1890, [60], ADDED.[1759417] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/27/2016 11:21 AM]
178
04/27/2016
LAW STUDENT, Rebecca Ojserkis for Jane Doe, in case 15-1890, [175], ADDED.[1759428] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/27/2016 11:26 AM]
179
04/27/2016
LAW STUDENT, Jonas Wang for Jane Doe, in case 15-1890, [176], ADDED.[1759432] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/27/2016 11:29 AM]
180
04/27/2016
LAW STUDENT, Erin Baldwin for Jane Doe, in case 15-1890, [174], ADDED.[1759437] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/27/2016 11:31 AM]
181
04/29/2016
ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1761268] [15-1890] [Entered: 04/29/2016 11:06 AM]
182
05/05/2016
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 05/05/2016 by CM/ECF. [1765862] [15-1890] [Entered: 05/05/2016 03:18 PM]
183
05/11/2016
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, FILED. Service date 05/11/2016 by CM/ECF. [1769979] [15-1890] [Entered: 05/11/2016 02:33 PM]
184
06/03/2016
LETTER, on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Veterans Legal Services Program, Protect Our Defenders and Service Women's Action Network, RECEIVED. Service date 06/03/2016 by CM/ECF.[1786035] [15-1890] [Entered: 06/03/2016 03:34 PM]
188
06/08/2016
ATTORNEY, James Anglin Flynn, for Amicus Curiae National Veterans Legal Services Program, Protect Our Defenders, Service Women's Action Network, TERMINATED.[1789460] [15-1890] [Entered: 06/08/2016 04:53 PM]
189
06/16/2016
CASE, before RCW, DAL, DC, C.JJ., HEARD.[1795064] [15-1890] [Entered: 06/16/2016 11:08 AM]
191
10/25/2016
NEW CASE MANAGER, Kimberly Murray, ASSIGNED.[1891810] [15-1890] [Entered: 10/25/2016 02:41 PM]
193
12/12/2016
NEW CASE MANAGER, Ahronda Crossman, ASSIGNED.[1924978] [15-1890] [Entered: 12/12/2016 11:11 AM]
194
01/09/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Michelle J. Anderson, Michael Asimow, Naomi R. Cahn, Erwin Chemerinsky, Esq., Robin Effron, Owen M. Fiss, Julie Goldscheid, Helen M. Hershkoff, Sylvia A. Law, Stephen Loffredo, Esq., David Marcus, Jerry L. Mashaw, Diane H. Mazur, Gillian E. Metzger, Mr. Burt Neuborne, Aziz Rana, Kermit Roosevelt, Michael D. Sant'Ambrogio, Joan E. Steinman, Stephen I. Vladeck and Adam Zimmerman, RECEIVED. Service date 01/09/2017 by CM/ECF.[1942830] [15-1890] [Entered: 01/09/2017 12:09 PM]
195
01/10/2017
ATTORNEY, Casey Lee, for Amicus Curiae, TERMINATED.[1944115] [15-1890] [Entered: 01/10/2017 12:47 PM]
197
07/03/2017
FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 07/03/2017, on behalf of Appellant Franklin Lee Hagenbeck and William E. Rapp, RECEIVED. Service date 07/03/2017 by CM/ECF.[2070521] [15-1890] [Entered: 07/03/2017 12:36 PM]
200
08/30/2017
OPINION, reverse the order of the district court, by RCW, DAL, DC, FILED.[2113113] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/30/2017 08:52 AM]
201
08/30/2017
OPINION, Dissenting, by judge DC, FILED.[2113125] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/30/2017 08:55 AM]
202
08/30/2017
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 08/30/2017, to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, ISSUED.[2113135] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/30/2017 08:58 AM]
203
08/30/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2113139] [15-1890] [Entered: 08/30/2017 08:59 AM]
221
10/23/2017
JUDGMENT, FILED.[2154129] [15-1890] [Entered: 10/23/2017 02:18 PM]

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.