Dolly A Bryant
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02071 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Intent
05/21/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
06/08/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate
25
08/02/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
31
09/01/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.