Dominico Magbutay Paguio and Rachel Ann Soriano Paguio
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-00126 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
doc
05/22/2018
Letter From State Court Re: Stayed Case
doc
05/23/2018
Letter From State Court Re: Stayed Case
doc
05/29/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
05/29/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/05/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
27
06/05/2018
Certificate of No Objection
28
06/06/2018
Entry of Appearance
29
06/06/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
06/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
06/18/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
31
06/18/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
06/21/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
33
06/21/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
06/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
10/10/2018
Modify Plan (After Confirmation)
35
10/10/2018
Modified Plan (After Confirmation) (BKPLAN03)
36
10/10/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
37
10/10/2018
Affidavit of Service
11/01/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
11/01/2018
Certificate of No Objection
39
11/01/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
40
11/01/2018
Approving Modification of Plan (BKPLAN05) (SA)
41
11/14/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.