Donald Fred Cole, III and Dawn Crystal Cole
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-05394 (alnb)

Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor

CERTIFICATE OF DEBTOR EDUCATION I certify that on 01/23/2018, Donald Cole completed a course on personal financial management given by Sage Personal Finance, an approved provider of debtor education in the Northern District of Alabama. Case Number: 17-05394 Certificate Number: 20181230611 Signed: /s/ Allison Geving, Ph.D. Title: President, Sage Personal Finance Case 17-05394-DSC13 Doc 14 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 11:33:20 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan After Confirmation. (Ch13troffice, cs)

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION) In Re:) DONALD FRED COLE, III) CASE NO. 17-05394-DSC13 DAWN CRYSTAL COLE)) Debtors.) TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO MODIFY PLAN AFTER CONFIRMATION COMES NOW Bradford W. Caraway, Chapter 13 Standing Trustee, and moves this Honorable Court to modify the confirmed plan pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1329(a) and increase payments to: $5753.00 MONTHLY As grounds therefore, the Trustee represents that the current payments are insufficient to complete the plan within the remaining time. WHEREFORE, the Trustee moves this Honorable Court to modify the confirmed plan and increase the plan payments accordingly. The Trustee requests such other relief as the Court deems appropriate. /s/ Bradford W. Caraway Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P.O. Box 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202 (205) 323-4631 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that a correct copy of the foregoing motion has been forwarded by Email or U.S. mail to the following on August 8, 2018. DONALD FRED COLE, III and DAWN CRYSTAL COLE BOND, BOTES, REESE & SHINN, P.C. /s/ Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee For the Northern District of Alabama Southern Division Case 17-05394-DSC13 Doc 24 Filed 08/08/18 Entered 08/08/18 12:16:35 Desc Page 1 of 1

Notice and Order on Trustee's Motion To Modify Confirmed Plan Increasing Plan Payments in the amount of $5,753.00 monthly Signed on 8/8/2018 (RE: related document(s)[24] Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan).

Van−104 [Notice & Order Modifying] (Rev. 09/15) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−05394−DSC13 Donald Fred Cole III Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−4626 Dawn Crystal Cole SSN: xxx−xx−2028 Debtor(s) NOTICE AND ORDER ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO MODIFY CONFIRMED PLAN INCREASING PLAN PAYMENTS Notice is hereby given that on 8/8/18 the Trustee filed a Motion to Modify the Debtor's Confirmed Plan to Increase Plan Payments. The Trustee requests that the payments be modified as the current Debtor's Chapter 13 payments are insufficient for the case to pay out in the time allowed. The Trustee requests that the payments be modified as follows: Increase Plan Payments in the amount of $5,753.00 monthly. It appears to the Court that said Motion is due to be GRANTED. Section 1329(b)(2) of the Bankruptcy Code [11 U.S.C. §1329(b)(2)] provides, "The plan as modified becomes the plan unless, after notice and a hearing, such modification is disapproved." It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the Trustee's Motion to Modify the Debtor's Confirmed Plan to Increase Plan Payments shall be deemed GRANTED as of 9/4/18, unless a written objection and request for a hearing are filed with the Clerk of the Court on or before 8/31/18. If an objection is filed, a hearing will be scheduled to consider both the Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan Payments and the objection and whether the modification should be disapproved. If no objection is filed, the Debtor's payments are modified as follows: Plan Payments are increased in the amount of $5,753.00 monthly. Dated: August 8, 2018 /s/ D. Sims Crawford United States Bankruptcy Judge jlp Case 17-05394-DSC13 Doc 25 Filed 08/08/18 Entered 08/08/18 15:17:31 Desc Notice & Order Modifying Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 76 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/29/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Donald Fred Cole III, Dawn Crystal Cole
2
12/29/2017
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Joint Debtor Dawn Crystal Cole, Debtor Donald Fred Cole III.
4
12/29/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Joint Debtor Dawn Crystal Cole, Debtor Donald Fred Cole III.
5
12/29/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Dawn Crystal Cole, Debtor Donald Fred Cole III.
12/29/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-05394-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21555161. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/29/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Joint Debtor Dawn Crystal Cole, Debtor Donald Fred Cole III.
7
12/29/2017
Appraisal Filed by Joint Debtor Dawn Crystal Cole, Debtor Donald Fred Cole III.
8
12/29/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/24/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/06/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/09/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/27/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 03/26/2018.
9
12/31/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 12/31/2017.
10
12/30/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
01/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Donald Fred Cole, Joint Debtor Dawn Crystal Cole). Notice Date 01/04/2018.
12
01/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/04/2018.
13
01/05/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jonathan Mancil Smothers Filed by Creditor Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.
14
01/23/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
15
01/23/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Joint Debtor
16
01/25/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 01/24/2018. (Ch13troffice, sc)
17
01/29/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
18
01/30/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/6/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
19
02/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/01/2018.
20
02/05/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Daniel Alan Ross Filed by Creditor USAA Federal Savings Bank.
21
03/08/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
22
03/15/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. The Trustees objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn. Signed on 3/15/2018 (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Donald Fred Cole, Joint Debtor Dawn Crystal Cole, 17 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
23
03/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 03/17/2018.
24
08/08/2018
Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan After Confirmation. (Ch13troffice, cs)
25
08/08/2018
Notice and Order on Trustee's Motion To Modify Confirmed Plan Increasing Plan Payments in the amount of $5,753.00 monthly Signed on 8/8/2018 (RE: related document(s)[24] Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan).
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.