Donald P Williams
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2017-bk-83592 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
61
10/26/2018
Limit Notice
66
12/09/2018
Debtor Objection to Claim
67
12/09/2018
Notice and Opportunity for Hearing
70
12/13/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
01/08/2019
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
01/08/2019
Withdraw As Attorney
80
01/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.