Donald Paul Brobst
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2015-bk-03479 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 804 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/01/2015
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Donald Paul Brobst Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 10/1/2015
09/01/2015
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(15-03479-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18422854. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
09/01/2015
Exhibit D Filed by Debtor Donald Paul Brobst.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Credit Counseling
1 Attachment
4
09/01/2015
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Donald Paul Brobst.
5
09/01/2015
Employee Income Records AFFIDAVIT OF INCOME Filed by Debtor Donald Paul Brobst.
6
09/01/2015
Tax Documents for the Year for 2013 Filed by Debtor Donald Paul Brobst.
7
09/01/2015
Tax Documents for the Year for 2013 (Federal) Filed by Debtor Donald Paul Brobst.
1
Volume(s) Part 2 #
2
Volume(s) Part 3 #
3
Volume(s) Part 4 #
4
Volume(s) Part 5
4 Attachments
8
09/02/2015
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
09/02/2015
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Donald Paul Brobst Case Number 85-11529, Chapter 7 filed in Illinois Northern Bankruptcy on 09/05/1985; Case Number 92-03993, Chapter 11 filed in Illinois Northern Bankruptcy on 02/21/1992, Dismissed for Other Reason on 05/21/1992; Case Number 92-12482, Chapter 7 filed in Illinois Northern Bankruptcy on 06/04/1992; Case Number 97-03614, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/16/1997, Standard Discharge on 04/11/2000.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
09/01/2015
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/28/2015 at 10:00 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 11/30/2015.
10
09/02/2015
Order Appointing Trustee. Thomas E Reynolds added to the case. Signed on 9/2/2015.
11
09/04/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 09/04/2015.
12
09/04/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 09/04/2015.
13
09/09/2015
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Donald Paul Brobst.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Completion
1 Attachment
14
09/09/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Compass Bank.
15
09/09/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Compass Bank.
16
10/28/2015
Subpoena to Witness Notice of Service of Subpoenas Filed by Creditor Sterling Bank, Div. of Synovus Bank.
1
Exhibit 1, 2 #
2
Exhibit 3, 4 #
3
Exhibit 5, 6 #
4
Exhibit 7
4 Attachments
17
10/30/2015
Motion for 2004 Examination Filed by Creditor Sterling Bank, Div. of Synovus Bank
18
11/03/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jared "Heath" Loftin Filed by Creditor Prattville Partners, LP.
19
11/03/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert D Reynolds Filed by Creditor Prattville Partners, LP.
20
11/09/2015
Order Granting Motion for Examination(Related Doc # 17) Signed on 11/9/2015.
21
11/11/2015
Motion to Extend Time - Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Motion to Dismiss Debtor's Case for Abuse Pursuant to Sections 707(a) and 707(b) of the Bankruptcy Code by Sterling Bank, a Division of Synovus Filed by Creditor Sterling Bank, Div. of Synovus Bank
22
11/11/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Order on Motion for Examination). Notice Date 11/11/2015.
23
11/12/2015
Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline (Related Doc # 21) Signed on 11/12/2015. Deadline extended to February 29, 2016.
24
11/14/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Order on Motion to Extend Time). Notice Date 11/14/2015.
25
12/16/2015
Notice of Intent to Abandon Interest in Property.
26
02/15/2016
Second Motion to Extend Time Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Motion to Dismiss Debtor's Case for Abuse Pursuant to Sections 707(a) and 707(b) of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Creditor Sterling Bank, Div. of Synovus Bank
27
02/16/2016
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual Filed by Debtor Donald Paul Brobst.
28
02/16/2016
Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline (Related Doc # 26) Signed on 2/16/2016.
29
02/17/2016
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Samuel Stephens, Attorney for Debtor, has not completed all information regarding page 2, #8 when filing the Amended Summary of Assets and Liabilities. SOLUTION: The filer, Samuel Stephens, Attorney for Debtor, should filed an Amended Summary of Assets and Liabilities. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 27 Schedule I: Your Income filed by Debtor Donald Paul Brobst, Schedule J: Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities).
30
02/18/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order on Motion to Extend Time). Notice Date 02/18/2016.
31
03/10/2016
Trustee's Request for Case Status Change Requiring Action Filed by Trustee Thomas E Reynolds.
32
03/11/2016
Notice to Creditors to File Claims within 90 days after the mailing of this notice. For governmental units, a proof of claim must be filed within the 90-day deadline or within 180 days after the date of the order for relief in this case, whichever is later
33
03/13/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Notice to Creditors to File Claims). Notice Date 03/13/2016.
34
03/14/2016
Motion to Dismiss Case for Abuse Filed by Creditor Sterling Bank, Div. of Synovus Bank
35
03/14/2016
Motion to Set Hearing (related documents 34 Motion to Dismiss Case for Abuse) After Debtor's Deposition Filed by Creditor Sterling Bank, Div. of Synovus Bank
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.