Donald Raymond Happs and Martha Louise Happs
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00265 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/13/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
08/13/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
3
08/13/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
08/14/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
08/15/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
8
08/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
9
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
09/13/2018
Request for Special Notice
13
09/21/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
14
09/25/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
15
09/26/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
16
09/26/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
09/26/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
09/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
10/03/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
10/05/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
20
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
21
10/17/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
10/18/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
10/29/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
24
10/29/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
25
10/29/2018
Certificate of Service
10/29/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.