Donald Stromberg-Prentke and Amanda May Stromberg-Prentke
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00006 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/14/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
01/14/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
3
01/14/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
01/14/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
01/14/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
6
01/14/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
7
01/14/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
01/14/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
01/15/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
01/16/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
01/16/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
13
01/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
14
01/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
15
01/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
16
01/17/2019
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
01/17/2019
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
01/17/2019
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
18
01/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
19
01/18/2019
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
20
01/18/2019
Generic Motion / Application
02/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
03/06/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
22
03/12/2019
Stipulation
23
03/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
24
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
25
03/20/2019
Approving Stipulation (SA)
26
03/21/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
03/21/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
03/21/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
28
03/21/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
29
03/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
03/23/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
31
03/23/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.