Donald W Joslin and April M Joslin
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00194 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/22/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
06/22/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
06/22/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
06/22/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
06/22/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
06/22/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
06/22/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
7
06/22/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
06/22/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
06/23/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
06/25/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
06/27/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
07/18/2018
Change of Address
07/19/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
08/07/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
16
08/07/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
08/21/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
08/21/2018
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.