Donald l. Trump and Susan m. Trump
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2005-bk-31301 (almb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 299 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/04/2005
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $209. Filed by Mark A. Cavanaugh on behalf of Donald L. Trump, Susan M. Trump.
2
05/04/2005
Debtor's Declaration re: Electronic Filing Filed by Mark A. Cavanaugh on behalf of Donald L. Trump, Susan M. Trump.
3
05/05/2005
First Meeting of Creditors, Trustee and Deadlines Assigned. Section 341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held 06/03/2005 at 01:30 PM in 341 Meeting of Creditors (4E), U.S. Bankruptcy Court, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL. The Trustee appointed to this case is Susan S. DePaola. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 08/02/2005.
4
05/05/2005
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(05-31301) [misc,volp7a] (209.00) filing fee. Receipt number 1385295, amount $ 209.00. (U.S. Treasury)
5
05/07/2005
BNC Certificate of Service - Meeting of Creditors - (RE: related document(s) 3 Auto Assign Meeting of Creditors-Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset,). No. of Notices: 16. Service Date 05/07/2005.
6
06/06/2005
Trustee's Final Report of No Distribution: The trustee states upon present information and belief there is no property available for distribution to creditors from the estate. The trustee requests this report be approved; the estate be closed; the trustee be discharged from office, and the bond of the trustee be canceled concurrent with the surety or sureties on the bond being released from further liability on said bond. (Non-Image Entry)
7
06/13/2005
Reaffirmation Agreement and Attorneys Declaration Between Debtor and Fairwinds Credit Union Filed by Fairwinds Credit Union.
8
06/13/2005
Reaffirmation Agreement and Attorneys Declaration Between Debtor and Fairwinds Credit Union Filed by Fairwinds Credit Union.
9
06/14/2005
Reaffirmation Agreement and Attorneys Declaration Between Debtor and Hyundai Motor Finance Filed by Hyundai Motor Hyundai.
10
06/21/2005
Reaffirmation Agreement and Attorneys Declaration Between Debtor and CitiMortgage, Inc. Filed by Mark A. Cavanaugh on behalf of Donald L. Trump, Susan M. Trump.
11
08/17/2005
Discharge Order Discharging Debtor(s)
12
08/18/2005
Order Discharging Trustee, Releasing Bond Liability and Closing Case. The estate of the above named Debtor having been fully administered, it is ORDERED that: The accounts and report of the Trustee are hereby filed;The Trustee be and is hereby discharged as trustee of the estate of the above named debtor and the bond is cancelled;and the Chapter 7 case of the above named Debtor is CLOSED. U.S. Bankruptcy Judge (Non-Image Entry)
13
08/19/2005
BNC Certificate of Service - Order of Discharge - (RE: related document(s) 11 Discharge Order Discharging Debtor(s)). No. of Notices: 16. Service Date 08/19/2005.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.