Donovan James Colbry, Sr. and Lucy A. Colbry
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2015-bk-00363 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
120
07/03/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
121
07/03/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
122
07/24/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
07/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
123
08/13/2018
Joinder
124
09/28/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
125
10/10/2018
Hearing
126
10/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
127
11/01/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
128
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
11/05/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.