Donovan Lambert
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-02564 (alnb)

Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mrs. Crowe shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #46; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Enslen Crowe, Attorney for Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC

17-02564-DSC13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Donovan Lambert } Case No: 17-02564-DSC13 SSN: XXX-XX-7052 } DEBTOR(S). } } } COURTROOM DEPUTY NOTES Matter(s): RE: Doc #46; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Enslen Crowe, Attorney for Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC Date and Time: Tuesday, February 13, 2018 10:00 AM Appearances: None Courtroom Deputy: Shewana Callies Presiding Judge: D. SIMS CRAWFORD Court Notes: By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mrs. Crowe shall submit a proposed order. Date Prepared:02/13/2018 Case 17-02564-DSC13 Doc 55 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 08:17:30 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor America's First Federal Credit Union

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE: DONOVAN LAMBERT DEBTOR Case No. 17 - 02564 - DSC13 Chapter 13 MOTION FOR RELIEF OF STAY COMES NOW America's First Federal Credit Union, a secured claimholder in the above styled cause, by and through its counsel, and respectfully moves this Court to grant a Relief from Stay in this case pursuant to Il U. S, C. 362 (d) to permit the Moyant to foreclose its security interest in the Debtor's property, and as grounds therefor, states as follows: 1. This Court has jurisdiction over this matter pursuant to 28U.S. C. . 1334, as referred uinder 28U.S. C. 157, and it constitutes a " core proceeding " within the latter statute. 2. This Motion is made pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 4001 and in conformity with Rule 9014. 3. Movarnt is precluded by force and effect of paragraphs (4) and () of Section 362 (a) of the Bankruptcy Code from enforcing Movant's lien against the property of the estate and property of the Debtor. 4. On or about November 26, 2013, the Debtor, Donovan Lambert, executed and delivered to America's First Federal Credit Union a Promissory Note and Security Agreement in the amount of $ 24, 000. 00. Collateral giveri is a 2009 Lexus ES350, VIN # JTHBJ46G992340250. 5. The Debtor filed a petition under Chapter 13 of the United States Bankruptcy Code on June 15, 2017, case number 17 - 02564 - DSC13. America's First Federal Credit Union was duly listed as a secured creditor therein. 6. The Debtor was at the time of filing the petition, and still is, justly and truly indebted. to Movant in the sum of $ 11, 527. 88 plus interest at a rate of ($ 8, 296. 47 at 3. 55 % and $ 3, 231. 41 at 0 %) per annuin. 7. The Debtor has allowed the insurance on the said collateral to lapse, and as suclı, America's First Federal Credit Union has been denied adequate protection for its collateral. 8, The Movant avers that there is no equity in the collateral and that the automatic stay is depriving it of its property without adequate protection in that the Debtor has failed to provide insurance. Case 17 - 02564 - DSC13 Doc 56 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 13: 46 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 4 9. Consequently, Movant is and will continue to suffer irreparable harın by continuation of the automatic stay, and appropriate relief should be granted. WHEREFORE, America's First Federal Credit Union moves for an order granting Relief from Stay and allowing it to proceed to take possession. of the above collateral and dispose of same in accordance with non bankruptcy law for the grounds set out herein. / s / J. Christopher Parker Attorney for Movant 1200. 4th Avenue, North Birmingham, AL 35203 (205) 320 - 4021 Case 17 - 02564 - DSC13 Doc 56 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 13: 46 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 4 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE: DONOVAN LAMBERT DEBTOR AA Case No. 17 - 02564 - DSC13 Chapter 13 AFFIDAVIT OF JILLIAN CRISWELL STATE OF ALABAMA JEFFERSON COUNTY BEFORE ME, the undersigned Notary Public, in and for said County and State, personally appeared, Jillian Criswell, who is known to me, and first being duly sworn, deposes and states as follows: 1. My name is Jillian Criswell. I am a resident and citizen of Blount County, Alabama and am above the age of 19 years. I am employed as the Collection Department Manager for America's First Federal Credit Union. I make this Affidavit voluntarily and based on my own personal knowledge and upon the books and records of America's First Federal Credit Union. 2. The Debtor, Donovan Lambert, executed a Retail Installment Contract and Note in favor of America's First Federal Credit Union on November 26, 2013, for a 2009 Lexus ES350, VIN # JTHBJ46G992340250. 3. The Debtor has failed to maintain insurance coverage on the said vehicle securing the debt as required in the security agreement. Further the Affiant saith not. (Elated areas Jillian Criswell swORN TO AND SUBSCRIBED BEFORE ME on this the 13 day of February, 2018. Norary PublidesRath Notary Public Commission Expires: B1 - 19 Case 17 - 02564 - DSC13 Doc 56 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 13: 46 Desc Main Document Page 3 of 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that I have this day served a copy of the above and foregoing document upon the debtor by placing a true and correct copy of same in the United States Mail, first cláss, postage affixed thereto to the address listed below and a copy to the Debtor's Counsel and Trustee via electronic mail as indicated below: Donovan Lambert 437 Marsh Circle Calera, AL. 35040 Brent. William Davis Attorney for Debtor brent @ bréntwdavis. corin Bradford W. Caraway: Chapter 13 Trustee ctmailach13bham. com Done on this the (3th day of February, 2018. / s / J. Christopher Parker Attorney for Movant 1200 4th Avenue, North Birmingham, AL 35203 (205) 320 - 4021 Case 17 - 02564 - DSC13 Doc 56 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 13: 46 Desc Main Document Page 4 of 4

Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor America's First Federal Credit Union (RE: related document(s) {{56}} Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).

Form Number. LR 4001 - 1 A. (07 / 10) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Donovan Lambert Case No. 17 - 02564 - DSC13 Chapter 13 ۔ یہ سنه مما ست Debtor (s) FACT SUMMARY SHEET FOR MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY OR FOR ADEQUATE PROTECTION IN CHAPTER 7 AND 13 CASES Type of Loan / Credit Transaction: PMSI Type of Collateral: 2009 Lexus ES350 Date of Loan / Credit Transaction 11 / 26 / 2013 Monthly Paymerit: 176. 55 Amount Financed: $ 24, 000 APR or Interest Rate: 3. 55 % Term of Loan: 66 months or. 5 1 / 2 years Payoff. Aimount:: SI1, 627. 13. as of 2 / 13 / 2018 (Date) L (Value) as of 2 13 / 2018 _ (Date) and NADA _ (Basis) . Value of Collateral and Basis; $ 10; 400 Address of real property: 1 / a Delinquent Pre - Petition Payments: What Montb (s) ? April – June 2017 Amount ? S529. 65 Claim filed ? . No Date claim filed: 07 / 27 / 2017 Claim Number 2 | Yes Number of Months of Pre - Petition Payment Default Put into Debtor's Chapter 13 Plan: n / a Delinquent Post - Petition Payinents: | n / a n / a What: Month (s) ? Amount of mortgage payiments ? Late Charges ? Court. Costs / Attorney's fees ? Total Amount Due Claim filed ? Date claim filed: n / a | n / a No Yes Claim Number Number of Post - Petition Payments Received (Not How Applied): Number of Post - Petition Payments Held by Créditor but Not Applied to Debt: Nunibër of Post - Petition Payments: Returned by Creditor to Debtor: 3 Trustee Disbursements Tn / a n / a If Lease, Lease Expiration Date: If Terminated, Lease. Termination Date: n / a n / a Insurer of Collateral: unknown Term of Insurance: (Expiration Date) Prior Stay Order (s) Involving Movant, Tncluding Current Case: Yes NO If yes, give case viumber (s) and date (s) of order (s) Case No .: Date: Case No .: Date: Case No .: Date: Debtor's Statement of Intention: n / a Date: 213 / 2008 Date: Submitted by: / s / J. Christopher Parker - (signature) Case 17 - 02564 - DSC13 Doc 57. Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 16: 55 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by America's First Federal Credit Union (RE: related document(s) {{56}} Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor America's First Federal Credit Union). Hearing scheduled 3/13/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.

Van−014 [Notice of Final Hearing] (Rev. 07/15) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−02564−DSC13 Donovan Lambert Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−7052 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING Notice is hereby given that Jason Parker, Attorney for America's First Federal Credit Union filed a Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay in the above−styled case. The preliminary hearing shall be consolidated with the final evidentiary hearing and parties are to be prepared for trial. The final hearing will be held to consider and act upon said Motion. Date: Tuesday, March 13, 2018 Time: 10:00 AM Location: Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 1, Birmingham, AL 35203 Attendance is not required if a settlement has been reached as approved by all parties and filed with the Court by an attorney prior to the hearing date. Dated: February 13, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court rwh Case 17-02564-DSC13 Doc 58 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 14:32:29 Desc Notice of Final Hearing Page 1 of 1

Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s)[42] Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).

Case: 17 - 02564 - DSC13 BENCH SHEET FOR HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS Hearing Date: 02 / 13 / 2018 Hearing Time: 10: 30 am Debtor: LAMBERT, DONOVAN Co - Debtor: Attorney: BRENT W DAVIS AND ASSOCIATES LLC Case Filed: 06 / 15 / 2017 Case Confirmed: 10 / 23 / 2017 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. () Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. (C) Case isCONVERTED to Chapter 7 on debtor's Notice of Conversion. () Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. (C) Trustee's WITHDRAWAL of Motion to Dismiss is ACCEPTED. O Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is CONDITIONALLY DENIED, pending compliance by the Debtor with these requirements. (1) the debtor shall cause a full plan payment to be received in the Trustee's office before 4: 00 p. m. on 03 / 15 / 2018; and, (2) the debtor shall cause all plan payments due during the next 12 months to be received in the full amounts due in the Trustee's office before 4: 00 p. m. on the dates due. If the debtor fails to satisfy these conditions, the Trustee may file a Notice of Continuing Default with the Court, with copies to the debtor and debtor's attorney, after which the Court may GRANT the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and may DISMISS this case without further notice or hearing. Begin Payments: 07 / 15 / 2017 Schedule 197. 00 BIWEEKLY Payment Method: DIRECT Terminated: T. M. 09 / 22 / 2017 Employer: SHELBY COUNTY COMMISSION Delinquency Since On Schedule: Actual Payments: Amount Delinquent: 07 / 15 / 2017 2, 987. 81 1. 387. 00 1, 600. 81 Balance Due Claims: Expected Admin: less Funds On Hand: Approximate Balance Due: 24, 584. 84 1, 684. 07 0. 00 26, 268. 91 (O) Trustee shall send a DIRECTION FOR DEDUCTION. (Plan payments are MODIFIED to $ . (OOTHER: Months (on Schedule) to Pay Out Case: 52 02 / 13 / 2018 Date: PC Case Filed 8 Months Ago (60 Month Plan) Last 12 Transactions 10 / 24 / 17 CASH 205. 00 10 / 16 / 17 (190. 00) NSF 10 / 10 / 17 PC 190. 00 09 / 22 / 17 SHELBY COUNTY 197. 00 09 / 22 / 17 SHELBY COUNTY 197. 00 09 / 01 / 17 SHELBY COUNTY 197. 00 08 / 14 / 17 SHELBY COUNTY 197. 00 08 / 07 / 17 SHELBY COUNTY 197. 00 07 / 20 / 17 SHELBY COUNTY 197. 00 Appearances Chapter 13 TrusteeU.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Debtor _ Joint Debtor _ Debtor's Attorney or Other Spouse (standing in) CHO KATERIMIENTO Deputy Clerk Case 17 - 02564 - DSC13 Doc 60 Filed 02 / 14 / 18 Entered 02 / 14 / 18 09: 26: 18 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Related Doc # [42]) Signed on 2/14/2018.

Van−124 [Order Dismissing Case] (Rev. 09/15) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−02564−DSC13 Donovan Lambert Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−7052 Debtor(s) ORDER DISMISSING CASE This matter came before the Court on 2/13/2018 for a hearing on the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case. The Court considered the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case, and it appears to the Court that said Motion is due to be GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: The Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED. Dated: February 14, 2018 /s/ D. Sims Crawford United States Bankruptcy Judge rwh Case 17-02564-DSC13 Doc 61 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/14/18 11:09:06 Desc Order Dismissing Case Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[58] Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 02/15/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-02564-DSC Donovan Lambert Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: rharless Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Feb 13, 2018 Form ID: van014 Total Noticed: 4 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 15, 2018. db +Donovan Lambert, 437 Marsh Circle, Calera, AL 35040-5032 cr +America's First Federal Credit Union, PO Box 11349, Birmingham, AL 35202-1349 9398290 +America's First Federal Credit Union, Member Services Department, Po Box 11349, Birmingham, AL 35202-1349 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. cr +E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Feb 13 2018 18:34:30 PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 TOTAL: 1 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 15, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 13, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Donovan Lambert brent@brentwdavis.com, 6167146420@filings.docketbird.com Enslen Crowe on behalf of Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC ndbankruptcy@sirote.com Jason Christopher Parker on behalf of Creditor America's First Federal Credit Union chrisp@amfirst.org, jenniferw@amfirst.org Thomas G Tutten on behalf of Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC ndbankruptcy@sirote.com Thomas G Tutten on behalf of Creditor M & T Bank ndbankruptcy@sirote.com TOTAL: 6 Case 17-02564-DSC13 Doc 62 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 Van−014 [Notice of Final Hearing] (Rev. 07/15) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−02564−DSC13 Donovan Lambert Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−7052 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING Notice is hereby given that Jason Parker, Attorney for America's First Federal Credit Union filed a Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay in the above−styled case. The preliminary hearing shall be consolidated with the final evidentiary hearing and parties are to be prepared for trial. The final hearing will be held to consider and act upon said Motion. Date: Tuesday, March 13, 2018 Time: 10:00 AM Location: Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 1, Birmingham, AL 35203 Attendance is not required if a settlement has been reached as approved by all parties and filed with the Court by an attorney prior to the hearing date. Dated: February 13, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court rwh Case 17-02564-DSC13 Doc 62 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 246 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/15/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Donovan Lambert
2
06/15/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert.
3
06/15/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert
5
06/15/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert.
6
06/15/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert.
7
06/15/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert.
8
06/15/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/12/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 08/01/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 10/10/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/12/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 09/11/2017.
9
06/16/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
06/16/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Donovan Lambert Case Number 05-03261, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 04/04/2005, Dismissed for failure to pay filing fee on 06/24/2008.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
06/16/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert). Hearing scheduled 7/18/2017 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
11
06/16/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
12
06/16/2017
Amended Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert
13
06/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 06/17/2017.
14
06/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert). Notice Date 06/18/2017.
15
06/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 06/18/2017.
16
06/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/18/2017.
17
06/19/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 12 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert).
18
06/20/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
19
06/27/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor M & T Bank.
20
07/12/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 7/12/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
21
07/19/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
22
07/19/2017
Trustee Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions. (Ch13troffice, km)
23
07/19/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 22 Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions). Hearing scheduled 8/1/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
07/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 07/21/2017.
25
07/31/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert.
26
07/31/2017
Motion to Determine Value of 2009 Lexus ES350 financed by America's First CU Filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert
27
08/01/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Brent William Davis, PDF has incorrect case number (17-2654). SOLUTION: The filer, Brent William Davis, should amend with the correct case number. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 26 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert).
28
08/03/2017
Amended Motion to Determine Value of 2009 Lexus ES350 financed by America's First CU to correct case number Filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert
29
08/03/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 28 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert). Hearing scheduled 8/29/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
30
08/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/05/2017.
31
08/10/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 8/10/2017 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing, 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 22 Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions). Hearing scheduled 8/29/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
32
08/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 08/12/2017.
33
08/27/2017
Amended Schedule A/B: Property Individual, Amended Schedule C, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert.
34
08/31/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
35
09/01/2017
Order Granting Motion to Determine Value of Collateral of 2009 Lexus ES350 financed by America's First Credit Union (Related Doc # 28) Signed on 9/1/2017.
36
09/03/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Order on Motion to Determine Value). Notice Date 09/03/2017.
09/20/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 232.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-02564-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (232.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21180889. Fee Amount 232.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-02564-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21290316. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
10/17/2017
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 17 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
38
10/23/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 10/23/2017 (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert, 21 Trustees Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn. (RE: related document(s) 22) Trustees Objection to Claim of Exemptions is sustained, any exemption for unknown amount is disallowed.
39
10/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 10/25/2017.
40
01/12/2018
*ENTERED IN ERROR - Filed using incorrect docket event* Trial Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct) Modified on 1/12/2018
41
01/12/2018
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Filed using incorrect docket event; will re-file using correct event Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway (RE: related document(s) 40 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). (Ch13troffice, ct)
42
01/12/2018
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct)
43
01/12/2018
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 42 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 2/13/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
44
01/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 43 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 01/14/2018.
45
01/19/2018
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert
46
01/19/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC
1
Note #
2
Mortgage #
3
Loan Modfication Agreement
3 Attachments
47
01/19/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC (RE: related document(s) 46 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
01/19/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-02564-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21625221. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 46) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
01/22/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtor, has used an incorrect docket event when filing the Motion to Suspend Plan Payments. SOLUTION: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtor, should enter a Corrective Entry relating to #45 stating the error, then refile. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 45 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert).
49
01/22/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC (RE: related document(s) 46 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC). Hearing scheduled 2/13/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
51
01/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 49 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 01/24/2018.
52
01/25/2018
Final Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtor, has used an incorrect docket event when filing the Motion to Suspend Plan Payments. SOLUTION: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtor, should enter a Corrective Entry relating to #45 stating the error, then refile. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 45 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Debtor Donovan Lambert).
53
02/01/2018
Notice to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply With Clerks Notice of Deficient Filing. (RE: related document(s) 52 Notice of Incorrect Event/Filing). Show Cause hearing to be held on 2/27/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
54
02/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 53 Notice to Show Cause). Notice Date 02/03/2018.
55
02/13/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mrs. Crowe shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #46; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Enslen Crowe, Attorney for Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
56
02/13/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor America's First Federal Credit Union
02/13/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-02564-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21716996. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 56) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
02/13/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor America's First Federal Credit Union (RE: related document(s) 56 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
58
02/13/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by America's First Federal Credit Union (RE: related document(s) 56 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor America's First Federal Credit Union). Hearing scheduled 3/13/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
60
02/14/2018
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s)[42] Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
61
02/14/2018
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Related Doc # [42]) Signed on 2/14/2018.
62
02/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[58] Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 02/15/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.