Doris Ann Daniel
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80867 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Order Rescheduling Confirmation Hearing (CRJ)
doc
05/21/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
doc
05/21/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
41
06/18/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
42
06/18/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
49
07/05/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
59
07/16/2018
Vacating Order
72
08/16/2018
Certificate of Financial Management Course
82
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
83
02/15/2019
Relief from Stay
02/15/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
02/15/2019
Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay
91
03/01/2019
Continue Hearing
92
03/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
99
03/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.