Douglas A. Gambone
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2019-bk-00099 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/29/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
03/29/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
03/29/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
03/29/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
03/29/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
03/29/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
03/29/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
6
03/29/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
7
03/29/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
03/30/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
03/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
03/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
03/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
03/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
04/01/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
04/01/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
04/08/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.