Doyle Greg Griffin
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00290 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/30/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
49
06/21/2018
Certificate of No Objection
50
06/21/2018
Certificate of Service
51
06/25/2018
Relief from Stay
06/25/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
53
08/24/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
54
08/24/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
09/17/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
09/17/2018
Certificate of No Objection
56
09/18/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
09/18/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
10/10/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
58
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.