Dry Creek Construction, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00360 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/22/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
10/22/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
10/23/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
3
10/23/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
4
10/23/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Corporation) (BNC Notice)
5
10/24/2018
Entry of Appearance
6
10/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
7
10/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
10/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
9
10/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
11/02/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
11
11/29/2018
Employ Nunc Pro Tunc (CM41)
12
11/29/2018
Declaration
12/01/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
12/06/2018
Order on Application to Employ Nunc Pro Tunc
14
12/11/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
01/11/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
01/23/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
01/23/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
02/08/2019
Employ (CM41)
17
02/08/2019
Affidavit
18
02/08/2019
Pay
19
02/08/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
20
02/08/2019
Employ
21
02/08/2019
Employ (CM41)
22
02/08/2019
Affidavit
23
02/08/2019
Employ
24
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/16/2019
Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
02/19/2019
Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)
26
02/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim
03/04/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
03/11/2019
Certificate of No Objection
28
03/20/2019
Sell Free and Clear of Liens (Hrg Rqd, Under 363(f)) (Fee) (CM21)
03/20/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
03/20/2019
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
30
04/02/2019
Setting Hearing (SA)
31
04/03/2019
Setting Hearing (SA)
32
04/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
33
04/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
04/11/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
04/12/2019
Memorandum in Support

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.