Duane D. Chapman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02111 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)
doc
05/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/22/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
38
09/11/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
45
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
47
02/07/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)
48
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.