Dunlap v. Alaska Radiology Associates, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cv-00143 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
147
05/23/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
148
05/25/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
149
06/04/2018
Quash
150
06/18/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
151
06/18/2018
Declaration
152
06/18/2018
Compel
153
06/18/2018
Declaration
154
06/20/2018
Hearing
155
06/25/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
156
07/02/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
157
07/02/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
158
07/02/2018
Declaration
159
07/06/2018
Seal
160
07/09/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
161
07/11/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
07/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
164
07/12/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
165
07/17/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
166
08/17/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
167
09/04/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
168
09/05/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
169
09/17/2018
Witness List
170
09/17/2018
Witness List
171
09/19/2018
Errata
172
10/31/2018
Order on Motion to Seal
173
10/31/2018
Take Deposition
174
11/05/2018
Order on Motion to Compel
175
11/14/2018
Response to Order
11/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
177
11/16/2018
Status Report
11/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
178
11/16/2018
Status Report
180
12/14/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
181
12/17/2018
Status Report
12/18/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
183
12/21/2018
Order
184
01/22/2019
Notice of Change of Address
185
01/29/2019
Substitute Attorney
186
01/29/2019
Notice of Appearance
187
01/30/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
02/01/2019
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
189
02/05/2019
Transcript
02/06/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
190
02/05/2019
Protective Order
191
02/05/2019
Declaration
192
02/05/2019
Declaration
193
02/05/2019
Expedite
195
02/12/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
196
02/12/2019
Declaration
197
02/13/2019
Notice (Other)
198
02/15/2019
Reply to Response to Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.