Dunn et al v. Tanger Factory Outlet Centers, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

1:2016-cv-00534 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 543 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/18/2016
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1972138, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hope Elly, Patrick Dunn, Christopher Thornton.
1
Exhibit Summons
2
Exhibit Summons
3
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112402409" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112402409','60095','12','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Exhibit Disclosure Statement) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2016: #
4
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112402958" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112402958','60095','12','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
4 Attachments
2
10/19/2016
Summons Issued as to Coroc/Riviera, LLC, Tanger Factory Outlet Centers, Inc. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.)
3
10/19/2016
Service Notice entered 10/19/2016. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 12/2/2016.
4
10/31/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly, Patrick Dunn, Christopher Thornton. Tanger Factory Outlet Centers, Inc. served on 10/24/2016, answer due 11/14/2016
5
10/31/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly, Patrick Dunn, Christopher Thornton. Coroc/Riviera, LLC served on 10/24/2016, answer due 11/14/2016
6
12/12/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Watkins on behalf of Coroc/Riviera, LLC, Tanger Factory Outlet Centers, Inc.
7
12/12/2016
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Coroc/Riviera, LLC, Tanger Factory Outlet Centers, Inc.
12/12/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
12/12/2016
ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from All Defendants not later than 1/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/12/2016.
9
01/11/2017
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Coroc/Riviera, LLC, Tanger Factory Outlet Centers, Inc.
01/12/2017
MOTIONS REFERRED: 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
01/12/2017
ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 the unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from Tanger Factory Outlet Centers, Inc. on 2/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/12/2017.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.