Dunn et al v. Target Corporation
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama

1:2016-cv-00453 (alsd)

NOTICE of Settlement by Hope Elly, Patrick Dunn

Case 1:16-cv-00453-KD-M Document 13 Filed 11/30/16 Page 1 of 2 IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION PATRICK DUNN and) HOPE ELLY,)) Plaintiffs,) CIVIL ACTION NO. v.)) 1:16-cv-00453-KD-M TARGET CORPORATION,) Defendant.)) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT The Plaintiffs hereby notify the Court the parties have reached a settlement of this matter, although the settlement agreement has not yet been executed. The parties anticipate the settlement agreement to be executed shortly. Respectfully Submitted, this the 30th Day of November, 2016./s L. Landis Sexton L. LANDIS SEXTON BPR # AL-5057N71L The ADA Group LLC 4001 Carmichael Road, Suite 570 Montgomery, Alabama 36116 334.819.4030 p 334.819.4032 f LLS@ADA-Firm.com Attorney for the Plaintiff [1] Case 1:16-cv-00453-KD-M Document 13 Filed 11/30/16 Page 2 of 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE This is to certify that I have this day filed with the Clerk of Court the aforementioned document for service of process by USPS mail or electronic mail, postage prepaid and properly addressed this 30th day of November, 2016 to the following: STARNES DAVIS FLORIE LLP Breanna H. Young 100 Brookwood Place, 7th Floor P.O. Box 598512 Birmingham, AL 35209 byoung@starneslaw.com/s L. Landis Sexton L. LANDIS SEXTON BPR # AL-5057N71L The ADA Group LLC 4001 Carmichael Road, Suite 570 Montgomery, Alabama 36116 334.819.4030 p 334.819.4032 f LLS@ADA-Firm.com Attorney for the Plaintiff [2]

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 631 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/25/2016
COMPLAINT against Target Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1948559, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hope Elly, Patrick Dunn.
1
Exhibit Summons
2
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112379897" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112379897','59848','8','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibit Disclosure Statement) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2016: #
3
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112380401" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112380401','59848','8','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
3 Attachments
2
08/26/2016
Summons Issued as to Target Corporation. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.
3
09/07/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly, Patrick Dunn. Target Corporation served on 9/1/2016, answer due 9/22/2016
4
09/19/2016
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Target Corporation.
5
09/19/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Target Corporation.
09/20/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Judge DuBose (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/20/2016
ENDORSED ORDER granting 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 10/14/2016. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/20/2016.
7
09/20/2016
Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement 5 filed by Target Corporation. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action.
09/20/2016
Answer due from Target Corporation on 10/14/2016. (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
09/20/2016
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement 5 filed by Target Corporation
9
10/13/2016
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading UNOPPOSED by Target Corporation.
10
10/13/2016
ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 10/28/2016. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/13/2016.
11
10/28/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Target Corporation.
12
10/31/2016
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER: The provisions of Rule 26(a)(1) are WAIVED. All discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Court Interrogatories due by 12/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 10/31/2016.
1
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112407296" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112407296','59848','40','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Consent)
1 Attachment
13
11/30/2016
NOTICE of Settlement by Hope Elly, Patrick Dunn
14
11/30/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time TO ANSWER COURTS INTERROGATORIES by Patrick Dunn, Hope Elly.
12/01/2016
REFERRAL OF 13 Notice of Settlement to Judge DuBose. (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/01/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 14 MOTION for Extension of Time TO ANSWER COURTS INTERROGATORIES Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
12/03/2016
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 the Joint Motion for Extension of Time. As requested, the time is extended to 12/24/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/3/2016.
16
12/06/2016
Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/6/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.