Dunn et al v. Walgreen co inc
Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-cv-00040 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 485 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/09/2017
COMPLAINT against Walgreen Co Inc, filed by Patrick Dunn, Austin Banks.
2
01/09/2017
Request for service by certified mail filed by Austin Banks, Patrick Dunn.
3
01/09/2017
CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Austin Banks, Patrick Dunn.
4
01/10/2017
NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action.
01/11/2017
Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601077169. (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/11/2017
Summons Issued as to Walgreen Co Inc. Sent via certified mail.
6
01/17/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Dunn, Austin Banks. Walgreen Co Inc served on 1/13/2017, answer due 2/3/2017.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.