Dunn v. Beeson Enterprises, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2015-cv-00130 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 692 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/25/2015
COMPLAINT against Beeson Enterprises, Inc., filed by Patrick Dunn.
2
02/25/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patrick Dunn.
3
02/26/2015
Filing fee re 1 Complaint: $ 400.00, receipt number 4602035810
4
03/03/2015
Summons Issued as to Beeson Enterprises, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of 1 Complaint.
5
03/06/2015
Return Receipt Card showing service of 4 Summons and 1 Complaint signed by (ILLEGIBLE) for Beeson Enterprises, Inc. served on 3/4/2015, answer due 3/25/2015.
6
03/23/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleading by Beeson Enterprises, Inc.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
7
03/23/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Beeson Enterprises, Inc.
8
03/23/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 3/23/2015. (no pdf document attached this entry)
9
04/08/2015
DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Beeson Enterprises, Inc.
04/08/2015
***Attorney Josh C. Harrison for Beeson Enterprises, Inc. added pursuant to 9 answer (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
04/09/2015
RULE 26(f) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/30/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 4/9/2015.
11
04/23/2015
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Beeson Enterprises, Inc., filed by Patrick Dunn.
12
04/30/2015
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
13
05/05/2015
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2016 before Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton III, in Mongomery, AL; Non-Jury Trial set for 3/7/2016 before Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton III, in Montgomery, AL; Amended Pleadings for plf due by 5/15/2015 and by the defendant by 6/5/2015; Discovery due by 10/16/2015; dispositive and daubert Motions due by 11/6/2015; Mediation Notice due by 12/2/2015, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/5/15. Furnished to calendar group & EB.
14
05/07/2015
ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint by Beeson Enterprises, Inc.
15
06/09/2015
MOTION for Extension of Expert Witness Disclosure Deadline by Patrick Dunn. Modified on 6/10/2015 to clarify text to reflect heading of motion PDF document (qc/djy,).
16
06/10/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Expert Witness Disclosure Deadline. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/10/15. (NO PDF document attached to this notice).
17
06/18/2015
Consent MOTION for Extension of Deadline TO EXCHANGE EXPERT DISCLOSURES by Beeson Enterprises, Inc.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
18
06/18/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of time to exchange expert disclosures. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/18/15. (NO PDF document attached to this notice).
19
07/31/2015
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal by Beeson Enterprises, Inc., Patrick Dunn. Modified on 8/3/2015 to add as also filed on behalf of the plf.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
20
08/03/2015
ORDER re 19 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal; it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/3/2015. (furn: calendar, eb) (term: PTC for 02/04/2016;Non-Jury Trial for 03/07/2016)
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.