Dunn v. Dollar General Corporation et al (consent)
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2015-cv-00766 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 607 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/20/2015
COMPLAINT against Dollar General Corporation, Networks USA IV (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602038746.), filed by Patrick Dunn.
1
Filing Fee Receipt
1 Attachment
2
10/20/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patrick Dunn.
10/21/2015
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Patrick Dunn. (NO PDF) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/21/2015
Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Dollar General Corporation, Networks USA IV.
4
10/29/2015
Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Eric (name illegible) for Dollar General Corporation served on 10/26/2015, answer due 11/16/2015.
5
11/02/2015
Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Dara Horner for Networks USA IV served on 10/26/2015, answer due 11/16/2015.
6
11/16/2015
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File an Answer or Response to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint and to File a Conflict Disclosure Statement by Dollar General Corporation, Networks USA IV.
7
11/17/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 6 Unoppsed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due from Dollar General Corporation on 11/20/2015; Networks USA IV on 11/20/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/17/2015. (NO PDF)
8
11/16/2015
Motion for John D. Bosco to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602039086.) by Dollar General Corporation, Networks USA IV. Added MOTION for Order directing electronic noticing on 12/4/2015.
1
Exhibit A, Proposed Order and Certificates of Good Standing
2
Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee Receipt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2015: #
3
Corrected Certificate of Good Standing
3 Attachments
9
11/19/2015
AMENDED TEXT ORDER correcting 7 Text Order. It is ORDERED that the 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer is granted through the date requested in the motion, 11/30/2015. Answer due 11/30/2015 from Dollar General Corporation and Networks USA IV. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/19/2015. (NO PDF)
10
11/30/2015
NOTICE by Patrick Dunn of Settlement
11/30/2015
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Doc. 7, Text Order mailed to John D. Bosco returned by USPS with the following notation, "Undeliverable as Addressed, Commercial mail receiving agent. Not authorized to accept mail for addressee." (NO PDF) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
12/04/2015
ORDERED that the 8 motion is GRANTED to the extent that it seeks admission pro hac vice; To the extent that the motion requests an order directing electronic noticing, the motion is DENIED as MOOT; further ORDERED that, on or before 12/15/2015, the parties shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal or other appropriate pleadings. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/4/2015.
12
12/15/2015
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Patrick Dunn.
12/15/2015
MOTION to Dismiss this Action Voluntarily Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2), by Patrick Dunn, as construed in the court's 18 Order. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc 12 for pdf) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/16/2015
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Dollar General Corporation, Networks USA IV. (NO PDF) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
12/16/2015
ORDER re 12 Conditional Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Patrick Dunn. The undersigned Magistrate Judge cannot enter judgment on a conditional stipulation of dismissal without written consents from all parties. It is ORDERED that the Clerk is DIRECTED to send to defense counsel a Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge. It is further ORDERED that, unless plaintiff files, on or before 12/28/15, a notice of dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) stipulating to the unconditional dismissal of this action either with or without prejudice, the parties are DIRECTED to execute and file, on or before 12/30/2015, either the attached form consenting to Magistrate Judgejurisdiction or the form requesting reassignment to a District Judge. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/16/2015.
14
01/05/2016
ORDER that this case is set for a Telephone Status Conference on 1/7/2016 at 03:00 PM before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Counsel for plaintiff is DIRECTED to set up the conference call. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/5/2016. Copies furnished to calendar group, JT.
15
01/04/2016
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Patrick Dunn.
16
01/04/2016
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Dollar General Corporation, Networks USA IV.
17
01/07/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker: Status Conference held on 1/7/2016 (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time 3:27 - 3:28.)
18
01/08/2016
ORDER construing 12 notice of dismissal as a motion to dismiss this action voluntarily pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2); ORDERED that plf's 12 motion to dismiss is GRANTED; Judgment will be entered dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/8/2016.
19
01/08/2016
FINAL JUDGMENT: it is the ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice; DIRECTING the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/8/2016.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.