Dunn v. Eagle Holdings, Llc, et al. (consent)
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2014-cv-00539 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 631 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/04/2014
COMPLAINT against Auro Swamy, Eagle Holdings LLC, S&S Eagles LLC, filed by Patrick Dunn.
2
06/04/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patrick Dunn.
3
06/05/2014
Filing fee re 1 Complaint: $ 400.00, receipt number 4602032169
4
06/10/2014
Summons Issued as to Auro Swamy, Eagle Holdings LLC, and S&S Eagles, LLC; mailed CMRRR with 1 Complaint.
5
06/16/2014
Return Receipt Card showing service of 4 Summons and 1 Complaint signed by (ILLEGIBLE) for Eagle Holdings, LLC served on 6/11/2014, answer due 7/2/2014.
6
06/30/2014
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
7
06/30/2014
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Auro Swamy.
06/30/2014
***Attorneys Daniel Jason Britt and James Clark Webb, IV for Eagle Holdings LLC and S&S Eagles LLC added by Clerk's Office pursuant to 6 Answer. (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/30/2014
***Attorneys Daniel Jason Britt and James Clark Webb, IV for Auro Swamy added by Clerk's Office pursuant to 7 Motion. (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
07/01/2014
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Eagle Holdings, LLC. Corporate Disclosures due by 7/11/2014.
1
Standing ORDER and sample format
1 Attachment
9
07/01/2014
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to S&S Eagles, LLC. Corporate Disclosures due by 7/11/2014.
1
Standing ORDER and sample format
1 Attachment
10
07/01/2014
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Auro Swamy. Corporate Disclosures due by 7/11/2014.
1
Standing ORDER and sample format
1 Attachment
11
07/01/2014
ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than July 31, 2014, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/1/14.
12
07/01/2014
ORDER directing that, upon consideration of Defendant's 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. The plaintiff shall file a response which shall include a brief and any evidentiary materials on or before July 15, 2014. 2. The defendant may file a reply brief on or before July 22, 2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/1/14.
13
07/02/2014
4 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to S&S Eagles, LLC. (RETURN TO SENDER-UNCLAIMED-UNABLE TO FORWARD)
14
07/02/2014
4 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Auro Swamy.(RETURN TO SENDER - UNCLAIMED - UNABLE TO FORWARD)
15
07/07/2014
RESPONSE to Motion re 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Patrick Dunn.
16
07/11/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Auro Swamy re 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
17
07/11/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Eagle Holdings, LLC re 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
18
07/11/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by S&S Eagles, LLC re 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
19
07/24/2014
ORDER directing that Swamy's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 7) is GRANTED and that, since all claims against him are dismissed, he is no longer a party to this suit in his individual capacity. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/24/14.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
20
07/31/2014
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
21
08/06/2014
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER setting: Final Pretrial Conference for 02/19/2015 in the Chambers of United States District Judge Mark E. Fuller, United States Courthouse, One Church Street, A-300, Montgomery, Alabama; Non-Jury Trial for 03/23/2015 in Montgomery, Alabama; Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2014; Discovery due by 12/31/2014; Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2014; Mediation Notice due by 12/15/2014; as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/6/14.
22
08/07/2014
(STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 26.3 RE NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) NOTICE by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Main Document 22 replaced on 8/8/2014). Modified on 8/8/2014.
23
08/08/2014
NOTICE of Non-Compliance re 22 Notice to reflect striking pursuant to Local Rule 26.3 re non-filing of civil discovery.
1
Local Rule 26.3
1 Attachment
24
08/21/2014
Case REASSIGNED to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller no longer assigned to the case.
25
08/26/2014
ORDER directing that the uniform scheduling order (doc. no. 21) is amended to reflect that the final pretrial conference is set for January 23, 2015, and the trial is set for the term of the court beginning on February 23, 2015, with all deadlines expressly tied to these two dates adjusted accordingly; further ORDERED that Sections 9, 10, and 11 of the uniform scheduling order (doc. no. 21) are amended as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/26/14. (Furnished to Calendar/AG)(Term'd: Final PTC 02/19/2015, Non-Jury Trial 03/23/2015)
26
09/04/2014
MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. Modified on 9/5/2014 to clarify docket text pursuant to PDF document.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A
2
Exhibit Exhibit B
3
Exhibit Exhibit C
4
Exhibit Exhibit D
5
Exhibit Exhibit E
6
Exhibit Exhibit F
7
Exhibit Exhibit G
8
Exhibit Exhibit H
9
Exhibit Exhibit I
10
Exhibit Exhibit J
10 Attachments
09/04/2014
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. (No PDF document attached to this entry; see 26 Motion to Dismiss) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
09/18/2014
MOTION to Stay and to Schedule Hearing by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
09/18/2014
MOTION for Hearing re 26 MOTION to Dismiss, by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. (No PDF document attached to this entry; see 27 Motion to Stay.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
09/19/2014
ORDER directing that the motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 26) is set for submission, without oral argument, on October 14, 2014, with any opposition brief due by October 3, 2014, and any reply to the opposition due by October 14, 2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/19/14.
29
09/19/2014
RESPONSE in Opposition re 27 MOTION to Stay and to Schedule Hearing filed by Patrick Dunn. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2014: # 1 Corrected certificate of service).
30
10/03/2014
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Patrick Dunn.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
6 Attachments
31
10/14/2014
REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Eagle Holdings, LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
5 Attachments
32
11/13/2014
MOTION to Strike Exhibit G Re 26 Motion for Summary Judgment by Patrick Dunn. Modified on 11/13/2014 to create relationship to 26 MSJ and correct text pursuant to PDF document.
11/13/2014
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 32 MOTION to Strike to reflect creating relationship to 26 MSJ and changing text to read "Motion to Strike Exhibit G Re 26 Motion for Summary Judgment" pursuant to PDF document. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
11/19/2014
MOTION for Summary Judgment With Supporting Memorandum of Law by Patrick Dunn.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
8 Attachments
11/19/2014
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment With Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Patrick Dunn. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
11/20/2014
Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene. Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody no longer assigned to the case as referral judge (NO PDF Document attached to this notice).
35
11/20/2014
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul W. Greene for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/20/2014.
36
12/11/2014
ORDER directing that this matter be and is hereby set for a mediation conference on January 8, 2015, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5-B, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; further ORDERED that counsel and the parties or a representative with full authority to settle the case shall appear at and attend this conference, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/11/14. (Furnished to Calendar/JT)
37
12/12/2014
Notice of Mediation and Settlement Conference by All Plaintiffs
38
01/05/2015
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL HEARING on January 23, 2015, at 11:30 AM in Chambers 200FMJ, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. U.S. Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; the parties are DIRECTED to prepare JOINTLY a proposed pretrial order in accordance with the attached outline; TRIAL TERM COMMENCES February 23, 2015, at 10:00 AM, in Montgomery, Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 01/05/2015. (Furnished to Calendar/WR)
39
01/06/2015
Defendants' RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Defendants' Supplement to Defendants' 26 MOTION to Dismiss and 26 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. Modified on 1/6/2015 to clarify docket text pursuant to PDF document.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
10
Exhibit J - Part 1
11
Exhibit J - Part 2
12
Exhibit J - Part 3
13
Exhibit K
14
Exhibit L
15
Exhibit M
15 Attachments
40
01/06/2015
MOTION to Cancel Voluntary Mediation Scheduled for January 8 2014, by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. Modified on 1/6/2015 to correct text pursuant to PDF document.
41
01/06/2015
ORDER directing that, upon consideration of defendants' status update regarding voluntary mediation (Doc. # 40), and for good cause, it is ORDERED that this matter be and is hereby set for a telephone conference call at10:30 AM on January 7, 2015, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 01/06/2015. (Furnished to Calendar/WR)
42
01/07/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker: Telephone Conference held on 1/7/2015 (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time 10:30 - 11:00.)
43
01/07/2015
MOTION to Inspect Premises, by Patrick Dunn. Modified on 1/7/2015 to correct docket text pursuant to PDF document.
01/07/2015
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 43 MOTION to Inspect Premises to reflect changing text pursuant to PDF document. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
01/12/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 43 MOTION to Inspect Premises filed by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
01/12/2015
MOTION for Alternate Scheduling Order, by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. (No PDF document attached; see 44 Response to Motion.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
01/14/2015
ORDERED that: (1) Plf's 43 Motion to Inspect Premises is DENIED; and (2) Dfts' 44 Motion for Entry of a New Scheduling Order and for Appointment of a Third Party Expert is DENIED; further ORDERED that Dfts' 27 Motion to Stay and to Schedule a Hearing and Dfts' 40 Motion to Cancel Mediation are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 1/14/2015.
46
01/14/2015
Witness List by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2015 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the e-government rules: # 1 Main Document (Redacted)). Modified on 1/15/2015.
47
01/14/2015
Exhibit List for Defendants by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2015: # 1 Corrected Certificate of Service).
48
01/14/2015
Deposition Designations of Defendants by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2015: # 1 Corrected Certificate of Service).
49
01/14/2015
Deposition Designations by Patrick Dunn.
50
01/14/2015
Exhibit List by Patrick Dunn.
51
01/14/2015
Witness List by Patrick Dunn. (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2015 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the e-government rules: # 1 Main Document (Redacted)). Modified on 1/15/2015.
52
01/14/2015
MOTION to Strike 39 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Patrick Dunn.
53
01/20/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 MOTION to Strike 39 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Exclude filed by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
5 Attachments
54
01/26/2015
TEXT ORDER RESETTING Final Pretrial Conference previously set for 1/23/15 to 1/29/2015 at 09:30 AM in chambers 200FMJ, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. U.S. Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Entered by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/26/15.
55
01/29/2015
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/29/15.
01/29/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson: Pretrial Conference held on 1/29/2015 (NO PDF ATTACHED). (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
01/30/2015
Joint MOTION to Continue and Request for Alternate Trial Schedule by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
57
01/30/2015
ORDER directing that the 56 parties' joint motion to continue and request for an alternate date for the bench trial of this matter is GRANTED; the bench trial, presently set for the week of February 23, 2015, is CONTINUED; a final pretrial conference and a trial date will be set by a separate order. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on January 30, 2015. (Furnished to Calendar/WR)
58
02/02/2015
Objection to re 47 Exhibit List filed by Patrick Dunn.
02/04/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker: Mediation Conference held on 2/4/2015 (NO PDF ATTACHED). (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
02/09/2015
Objection to re 58 Objection to Defendants' Trial Exhibits filed by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
1
Exhibit C
2
Exhibit D
3
Exhibit F
4
Exhibit G
5
Exhibit H
6
Exhibit J
7
Exhibit K
8
Exhibit L
9
Exhibit N
10
Exhibit O
11
Exhibit U-1
12
Exhibit U-2
13
Exhibit V-1
14
Exhibit V-2
15
Exhibit W
16
Exhibit X-Cover
16 Attachments
60
02/19/2015
RESPONSE to Defendants' Opposition to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment With Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Patrick Dunn. Modified on 2/20/2015 to clarify text to reflect as RESPONSE to 39 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION (qc/djy,).
61
02/23/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re 52 MOTION to Strike 39 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Patrick Dunn.
62
02/23/2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) Plaintiff's motions to strike (Docs. 32 & 52) are GRANTED to the extent that the exhibits will not be permitted as expert testimony or for any other purpose than that discussed supra; (2) To the extent that Plaintiff's second motion to strike (Doc. 52) requests leave of court to file a reply brief in support of his motion for summary judgment, that request is MOOT as Plaintiff subsequently filed such a brief; (3) Defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, motion for summary judgment (Doc. 26) and motion for a hearing (Doc. 27) are DENIED; (4) The court DEFERS ruling on Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 33) until subject matter jurisdiction over this action can be assured; (5) The parties are ORDERED to refrain from filing a motion for attorney's fees under the theory that the party is a prevailing party until final judgment has been entered by the court; (6) Defendants' request for attorney's fees and costs based on allegations of bad faith by Plaintiff's counsel are not properly before the court in that they have not been submitted in the form of a separate motion, but are embedded in the body of briefing related to the motion to dismiss and motion for summary judgment; as such, the request will not be considered; (7) Consistent with the court's inherent authority to control the pretrial management of litigation in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and on consideration of the material issues presented in this case and Defendants' renewed challenge to the court's subject matter jurisdiction, a short period of limited discovery to ascertain the effects of Defendants' ADA remediation efforts at Liberty is appropriate and necessary, as further set out; Plaintiff and his retained expert are granted leave to inspect Liberty by March 16, 2015, for the purpose of determining what, if any, ADA violations remain at issue in this litigation in light of Defendants' counsels' representations that the property is ADA compliant and that all relief requested by Plaintiff has been satisfied, as further set out; if the parties cannot agree on a date and time for the inspection, the parties are ORDERED to inspect Liberty at 10:00 AM on March 16, 2015; (8) The parties are ORDERED to confer face-to-face and to file a joint status report, by March 30, 2015, setting forth their areas of agreement, if any, regarding the ADA compliance status of Liberty as it relates to Plaintiff's Title III ADA claim and his requests for injunctive relief, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on February 23, 2015.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
63
03/03/2015
MOTION for an order appointing a neutral, third-party expert, or in the alternative, MOTION for leave to complete responsive discovery by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. Added alternative MOTION on 3/4/2015 pursuant to PDF document.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
64
03/04/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re 63 MOTION order appointing a neutral, third-party expert MOTION for leave to complete responsive discovery filed by Patrick Dunn.
65
03/05/2015
ORDER denying 63 Motion to appoint a neutral expert, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on March 5, 2015.
66
03/13/2015
MOTION for Extension of Deadline re 62 Memorandum Opinion and Order, by Patrick Dunn.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
67
03/13/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Deadline. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 03/13/2015. (No PDF document attached to this entry.)
68
04/01/2015
First MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss, by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2015: # 1 Corrected certificate of service). Modified on 6/2/2015 to clarify docket text pursuant to PDF document.
69
04/02/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re 68 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss, filed by Patrick Dunn. Modified on 6/2/2015 to clarify docket text pursuant to PDF document.
70
04/04/2015
Second MOTION to Stay Litigation by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
71
04/04/2015
First MOTION For Court to Inspect Subject Property at Issue by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
72
04/06/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re 70 Second MOTION to Stay Litigation filed by Patrick Dunn.
73
04/06/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re 71 First MOTION For Court to Inspect Subject Property at Issue filed by Patrick Dunn.
74
04/06/2015
STATUS REPORT by Patrick Dunn.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
75
05/22/2015
First MOTION for Daniel Jason Britt to Withdraw as Attorney by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
76
05/26/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 75 Motion for Daniel Jason Britt to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 5/26/2015. (no pdf document attached to this entry)
05/26/2015
*** Attorney Daniel Jason Britt terminated pursuant to the court's 76 order. (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
06/04/2015
ORDER directing that Defendants' second motion for a court appointed "neutral, third-party expert" or, alternatively, for leave to conduct additional discovery (Doc. 63), motion for leave to file a motion to dismiss (Doc. 68), and second motion to stay (Doc. 70) are DENIED, as further set out; the motion for court inspection of the subject property (Doc. 71) is DENIED, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on June 4, 2015.
78
06/04/2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 33) is DENIED, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on June 4, 2015.
79
06/04/2015
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL HEARING AND PRETRIAL REQUIREMENTS. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on June 4, 2015. (Furnished to Calendar/WR/Clerk of Court)
80
06/19/2015
Equitable Relief Claimed or Sought re 79 Order by Patrick Dunn. Modified on 6/19/2015 to clarify text pursuant to PDF document.
81
07/01/2015
Deposition Designations by Patrick Dunn.
82
07/01/2015
Exhibit List by Patrick Dunn.
83
07/01/2015
Witness List by Patrick Dunn.
84
07/01/2015
Deposition Designations for Trial by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
85
07/01/2015
Exhibit List for Trial by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
86
07/01/2015
Witness List by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
87
07/09/2015
Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Dunn's Equitable Relief Claimed or Sought, First MOTION to Strike 80 Response to Order as Dunn's Equitable Relief Claimed or Sought by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
88
07/14/2015
TEXT ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4E is RESET to Courtroom 4B before Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene. Entered by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 7/14/15. (NO PDF ATTACHED).
89
07/14/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re 87 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Dunn's Equitable Relief Claimed or SoughtFirst MOTION to Strike 80 Response to Order as Dunn's Equitable Relief Claimed or Sought filed by Patrick Dunn.
90
07/14/2015
Objection to re 84 Deposition Designations filed by Patrick Dunn.
91
07/14/2015
Objection to re 85 Exhibit List filed by Patrick Dunn.
92
07/14/2015
Objection to re 86 Witness List filed by Patrick Dunn.
93
07/14/2015
First MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
94
07/14/2015
Second MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
95
07/14/2015
Third MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
96
07/14/2015
Fourth MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
97
07/14/2015
Fifth MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
98
07/14/2015
Sixth MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
99
07/14/2015
Eighth MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
100
07/14/2015
Ninth MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
101
07/15/2015
Seventh MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC.
102
07/15/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene: Pretrial Conference held on 7/15/2015 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter FTR: 12:58 - 1:52.) (Main Document 102 replaced on 7/22/2015).
103
07/20/2015
FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER setting Non-Jury (bench) Trial for 9/15/2015 @ 08:30 AM before Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene, in Courtroom 4E, US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL, as further set out in order; directing the clerk to provide a court reporter for the trial. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 7/20/2015. Furnished to calendar group & WR.
104
07/21/2015
(STRIKEN PURSUANT TO 108 ORDER) RESPONSE to Motion re 98 Sixth MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits, 96 Fourth MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits, 94 Second MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits, 101 Seventh MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits, 93 First MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits, 97 Fifth MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits, 100 Ninth MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits, 95 Third MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits, 99 Eighth MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Exhibits filed by Patrick Dunn. Modified on 7/23/2015.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
9 Attachments
105
07/21/2015
(STRIKEN PURSUANT TO 109 ORDER) RESPONSE to plf's 92 Objections to witnesses by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. Modified on 7/28/2015.
106
07/21/2015
(STRIKEN PURSUANT TO 109 ORDER) RESPONSE to plf's 90 Objections to deposition designations by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. Modified on 7/28/2015.
107
07/21/2015
(STRIKEN PURSUANT TO 109 ORDER) RESPONSE to plf's 91 Objections to Exhibits by Eagle Holdings, LLC, S&S Eagles, LLC. Modified on 7/28/2015.
1
Exhibit F
2
Exhibit G
3
Exhibit H
4
Exhibit I
5
Exhibit J
6
Exhibit K
7
Exhibit L
8
Exhibit N
9
Exhibit O
10
Exhibit P
11
Exhibit S
12
Exhibit U
13
Exhibit V
14
Exhibit W
15
Exhibit X
16
Exhibit AA
16 Attachments
108
07/23/2015
ORDER directing as follows: (1) plf's re 104 Response to the Motions in limine is STRICKEN from the record as having been improvidently filed; (2) defs are not to file a reply in support of their motions in limine, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 7/23/15.
109
07/28/2015
ORDER directing that the 105, 106, and 107 Responses are STRICKEN from the record, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 7/28/15.
110
07/29/2015
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial conference Proceedings (PDF ACCESS RESTRICTED FOR 90 DAYS) held on July 15, 2015, before Judge Greene. Court Reporter/Transcriber Entrekin, Telephone number 334-240-2405. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION DUE WITHIN 7 BUSINESS DAYS. Redaction Request due 8/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2015.
111
07/29/2015
ORDER directing the parties to contact Judge Walker's chambers staff on or before 5:00 PM CDT on 7/31/2015, in a telephone conference call in which all counsel of record shall participate; lead counsel for the plf is to set up the call. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 7/29/15. Furnished to calendar group, WR & JT; cc to SRW.
112
08/05/2015
ORDER directing that the Mediation Conference in this case shall reconvene on 8/13/2015 @ 01:30 PM before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker, in Courtroom 5B, FMJ US Courthouse Complex, Montgomery, AL; further ORDERING that all counsel of record and the parties or a representative with full authority to settle the case shall appear at and attend this conference; on or before 8/10/2015 each party shall provide the undersigned with a revised confidential medication conference statement, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/5/15. Furnished to calendar group & JT.
08/13/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker: Mediation Conference held on 8/13/2015 (NO PDF ATTACHED). (Text entry; no document attached.)
113
08/17/2015
ORDERED that a telephone conference between the court and counsel for theparties only is set for August 18, 2015 at 2:00 PM Counsel for the plaintiff is DIRECTED to set up the call. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/17/2015. (furn: calendar, JT)
114
08/17/2015
AMENDED ORDER directing that the Telephone Conference set for 8/18/2015 @ 2:00 PM is rescheduled for 8/18/2015 @ 10:00 AM before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker; directing counsel for the plaintiff to set up the call. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/17/15. Furnished to calendar group & JT. Modified on 8/17/2015 to clarify text to reflect as amended (qc/djy,).
08/18/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker: Reconvening Mediation Conference held on 8/18/2015 (NO PDF ATTACHED). (Text entry; no document attached.)
115
08/19/2015
Response to Order re 103 Pretrial Order, Set Hearings, Statement of Facts by Patrick Dunn.
1
Exhibit Redlined Version
1 Attachment
116
08/27/2015
ORDERED that a mediation status conference with counsel by telephone is set for August 28, 2015 at 4:15 PM Counsel for the plaintiff is DIRECTED to set up the call. It is further ORDERED that if the case is settled prior to the conference call, the parties shall so notify the court and the call will not go forward. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/27/2015. (furn: JT, Calendar)
117
08/28/2015
ORDERED that on or before September 11, 2015 the parties shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal or other appropriate pleadings. The mediation status conference previously scheduled for 4:15 PM on this date is hereby cancelled. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/28/2015. (Term: Mediation Conference set for 08/28/2015)
118
09/10/2015
MOTION to Dismiss by Patrick Dunn.
119
09/11/2015
ORDER GRANTING 118 motion to dismiss; this action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice; costs are taxed as paid; directing the clerk to enter final judgment pursuant to Rule 58; all settings and deadlines are termintaed; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 9/11/15. Furnished to calendar group and WR.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.