Dunn v. First Family Restaurants, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

2:2014-cv-00906 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 488 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/28/2014
COMPLAINT against First Family Restaurants, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602033417.), filed by Patrick Dunn.
1
Filing Fee Receipt
1 Attachment
2
08/28/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patrick Dunn.
3
08/29/2014
Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to First Family Restaurants, Inc.
4
09/08/2014
Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by name illegible for First Family Restaurants, Inc. served on 8/30/2014, answer due 9/22/2014.
5
10/08/2014
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Patrick Dunn against First Family Restaurants, Inc.
10/09/2014
5 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default with file hand delivered to Clerk of Court. (NO PDF attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/17/2014
ANSWER to 1 Complaint DENYING ALLEGATIONS by First Family Restaurants, Inc.
7
10/17/2014
MOTION Motion to Deny Entry of Default Judgment re 5 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by First Family Restaurants, Inc.
10/20/2014
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default 5 will not be entered based on an Answer having been filed. (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
11/12/2014
RULE 26(F) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/26/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/12/2014.
9
11/17/2014
ORDER directing that the motion to deny entry of default (doc. no. 7) is denied as moot, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/17/14.
10
11/26/2014
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
11
12/05/2014
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2015 before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Non-Jury Trial set for 10/15/2015 before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Amended Pleadings due by plaintiff(s) on or before 12/15/2014, and by the defendant(s) on or before 12/15/2014. Discovery due by 7/1/2015. Motions due by 6/12/2015. Mediation Notice due by 7/8/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/5/2014. Copies furnished to calendar group, AG.
12
12/15/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by First Family Restaurants, Inc.
13
03/17/2015
MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Patrick Dunn.
14
03/30/2015
JUDGMENT it is ORDERED that: (1) The 13 motion to dismiss without prejudice is granted. (2) This lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety without prejudice, with costs taxed as paid. The court assumes that the defendant has no objection to the allowance of the dismissal; however, if it does, it must file the objection within seven days from the date of this order. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/30/2015.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist)(Furn: AG, Calendar)(Term: FPTC for 09/10/2015; Non-Jury Trial for 10/15/2015
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.