Dunn v. Junior Food Stores of West Florida, Inc. (mag2)
Court Docket Sheet

2:2016-cv-00341 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 513 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/12/2016
COMPLAINT against Junior Food Stores of West Florida, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602041137.), filed by Patrick Dunn.
1
Filing Fee Receipt
1 Attachment
2
05/12/2016
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patrick Dunn.
3
05/13/2016
Summons Issued as to Junior Food Stores of West Florida, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of 1 complaint.
4
05/17/2016
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and 1 Complaint signed by Avery Harris for Junior Food Stores of West Florida, Inc. served on 5/16/2016, answer due 6/6/2016.
5
06/06/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Junior Food Stores of West Florida, Inc.
6
06/06/2016
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Junior Food Stores of West Florida, Inc.
06/06/2016
***Attorney Elizabeth Darby Rehm for Junior Food Stores of West Florida, Inc. added pursuant to the 5 answer. (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2016
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Junior Food Stores of West Florida, Inc. (no pdf document attached this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
06/10/2016
ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than June 24, 2016, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/10/2016.
8
06/23/2016
Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline Obligations in the Court's Initial Order by Junior Food Stores of West Florida, Inc., Patrick Dunn. Modified on 6/23/2016 to add as filed on behalf of the plaintiff.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
06/23/2016
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Patrick Dunn (no pdf document attached this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
06/23/2016
ORDER granting 8 Joint Motion to Continue Deadline Obligations in the Court's Initial Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/23/2016.
10
07/22/2016
Joint MOTION to Continue Court's Rule 26(f) Order by Patrick Dunn, Junior Food Stores of West Florida, Inc. Modified on 7/22/2016 to add as filed on behalf of the defendant.
11
07/22/2016
ORDER granting 10 Joint Motion to Continue. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/22/2016. Modified on 7/27/2016 to correct the text to say "granting".
12
08/22/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
13
08/25/2016
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge.
14
08/25/2016
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/25/2016.
15
08/30/2016
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: An on-the-record pretrial conference is scheduled for September 1, 2017, in the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama. This cause is set for trial during the term of court commencing on October 2, 2017, in Montgomery, Alabama. Motions due by 3/1/2017; Mediation Notice due by 3/29/2017; Amended Pleadings due by 11/14/2016; Discovery due by 2/1/2017, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/30/2016. (furn: AG, Calendar)
16
12/27/2016
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of Expert Disclosures by Junior Food Stores of West Florida, Inc.
17
01/04/2017
TEXT ORDER granting 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of Expert Disclosures. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/4/2017. (no pdf document attached to this entry)
18
01/10/2017
NOTICE by Junior Food Stores of West Florida, Inc. Rule 26(a)(2)(B) Disclosure
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.